UpRight Law et al v. Gargula
Appellant: Albert Dean Johnson, II, UpRight Law, Jason T Turner, Kelly Jo Clark, Jason L Lindsey, Daryl G. Kulik, Donald G. Lankford, Tiffany L. Cannon, David Anthony Miller, Betty A. Corey, Terry W. Dedmon, Jeffrey S. Thulin, Wendell B. Haws, Julie Bayles Thulin, Ariel Victoria Mounce, Pamela S. Jones, Clint J. Jones, Angela Jane Brucker, Harold F. Lalumondiere, Lisa A. Lalumondiere, Charles L. Crow, Kerri Lynn Sierra-Scott, Arnold T. Edwards, Mary Ruth VanDeventer, Brandi S Hill, Annette F. Crow, Boyce Allen Burns, Jamie L. Brucker, Sandra K. Dennis, Jeanette Gay Davis, Shaune K. Scruggs, Christy Kaye Schnack, Khristie Rae Gable, Angie M McClatchery, Thomas Paul Schnack, Andrea L Lindsey, Rachael M. Hohensee, Marc J. Clark, Peggy A. Chapman, George H. Wise, Micah T. Scruggs, Chelsea Lynne Potter, Kristyn M. Curry, Ross Everett VanDeventer, John A. Smiley, Tracy D. Edwards, Megan N Beckemeyer, Amanda Lane Burns, Richard Donald Davis, Jr. and Cullen J. Bond
Interested Party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Appellee: Nancy Gargula
Case Number: 3:2020cv01006
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #8 Objection Appellants' Reply to US Trustee's Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Pursue Interlocutory Appeal filed by UpRight Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lavery, Mark)
November 4, 2020 Filing 49 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Jason T Turner (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 48 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Jeffrey Thulin and Julie Thulin (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 47 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant John A. Smiley (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 46 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Kerri Lynn Sierra-Scott (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 45 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Chelsea Lynne Potter (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 44 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant by Ariel Victoria Mounce (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 43 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Andrea L Lindsey and Jason L Lindsey (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 42 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Donald G. Lankford (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 41 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Harold F. Lalumondiere and Lisa A. Lalumondiere (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 40 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Brandi S Hill (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 39 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Sandra K. Dennis (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 38 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Kristyn M. Curry (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 37 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Betty A. Corey (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 36 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Kelly Jo Clark and Marc J. Clark (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 35 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Amanda Lane Burns and Boyce Allen Burns (kls3)
November 4, 2020 Filing 34 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Cullen J. Bond (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Stay Briefing. The briefing schedule is now SUSPENDED for all cases consolidated in this appeal until the Court rules on Appellee's #8 Objection to Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellants shall respond to the #8 Objection to Bankruptcy Appeal on or before November 17, 2020. The #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/3/2020. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Brief by UpRight Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lavery, Mark)
November 3, 2020 Filing 31 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant George H. Wise (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 30 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Mary Ruth VanDeventer and Ross Everett VanDeventer (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 29 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Micah Scruggs and Shaune Scruggs (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 28 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant David Anthony Miller (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 27 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Angie M McClatchery (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Daryl G. Kulik (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Clint J. Jones and Pamela S. Jones (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay / United States Trustee's Motion to Stay Briefing filed by UpRight Law. (Lavery, Mark)
November 3, 2020 Filing 23 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Albert Dean Johnson, II (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 22 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Rachel M. Hohensee (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Wendell B. Haws (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Arnold T. Edwards and Tracy D. Edwards (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Terry W. Dedmon and Khristie Rae Gable (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Annette F. Crow and Charles L. Crow (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant by Peggy A. Chapman (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant by Tiffany L. Cannon (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellants Jamie L. and Angela Jane Brucker (kls3)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 Bankruptcy Documents filed regarding Appellant Megan N Beckemeyer (kls3)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay / United States Trustee's Motion to Stay Briefing by Nancy Gargula. (Triebold, Ellen)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER wherein Motions to Close Case filed by UpRight Law, LLC and the Debtors are DENIED. Signed by Laura K. Grandy, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge on 10/30/2020. (kls3)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 OPINION wherein Motions to Close Case filed by UpRight Law, LLC and the Debtors are DENIED, signed by Laura K. Grandy, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge on 10/30/2020. (kls3)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #2 Bankruptcy Appeal by Nancy Gargula /United States Trustee's Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Leave to Pursue Interlocutory Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Triebold, Ellen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Appellee Nancy J. Gargula's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal on Bankruptcy Appeal by Nancy Gargula re #2 Bankruptcy Appeal (kls3)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Judge Staci M. Yandle and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future filings shall be made in the lead case number 20-1006-SPM and shall bear the lead case number 20-1006-SPM. (dkd)
October 15, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per the Consolidation Order entered on October 14, 2020: All future filings shall be made in case number 20-cv-1006-SMY. (kls3)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Appellant's Statement of Issues on Appeal and Designation of Record on Bankruptcy Appeal by UpRight Law re #2 Bankruptcy Appeal (kls3)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/14/2020. (sgp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Doc. #4 ). Response to Notice of Appeal (Doc. #2 ) due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/6/2020. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Bankruptcy Appeal by Nancy Gargula. (Triebold, Ellen)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen L. Triebold on behalf of Nancy Gargula (Triebold, Ellen)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-60320, filed by UpRight Law, Albert Dean Johnson, II. Appellant Brief due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Information Sheet)(kls3)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-1006-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UpRight Law et al v. Gargula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Albert Dean Johnson, II
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UpRight Law
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Represented By: Mark T. Lavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jason T Turner
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kelly Jo Clark
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jason L Lindsey
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daryl G. Kulik
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald G. Lankford
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tiffany L. Cannon
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Anthony Miller
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Betty A. Corey
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Terry W. Dedmon
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jeffrey S. Thulin
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wendell B. Haws
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julie Bayles Thulin
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ariel Victoria Mounce
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pamela S. Jones
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clint J. Jones
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Angela Jane Brucker
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Harold F. Lalumondiere
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lisa A. Lalumondiere
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Charles L. Crow
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kerri Lynn Sierra-Scott
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Arnold T. Edwards
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Ruth VanDeventer
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brandi S Hill
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Annette F. Crow
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Boyce Allen Burns
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jamie L. Brucker
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandra K. Dennis
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jeanette Gay Davis
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shaune K. Scruggs
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christy Kaye Schnack
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Khristie Rae Gable
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Angie M McClatchery
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Thomas Paul Schnack
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrea L Lindsey
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rachael M. Hohensee
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marc J. Clark
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peggy A. Chapman
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: George H. Wise
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Micah T. Scruggs
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chelsea Lynne Potter
Represented By: Eric James Homa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kristyn M. Curry
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ross Everett VanDeventer
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John A. Smiley
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tracy D. Edwards
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Megan N Beckemeyer
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Amanda Lane Burns
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Donald Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cullen J. Bond
Represented By: James E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy Gargula
Represented By: Mark D. Skaggs
Represented By: Ellen L. Triebold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?