UpRight Law et al v. Gargula
Appellee: Nancy J. Gargula
Interested Party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Appellant: Tiffany L. Cannon and UpRight Law
Case Number: 3:2020cv01018
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Judge Staci M. Yandle and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future filings shall be made in the lead case number 20-1006-SPM and shall bear the lead case number 20-1006-SPM. (dkd)
October 15, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per the Consolidation Order entered on October 14, 2020: All future filings shall be made in case number 20-cv-1006-SMY. (kls3)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/14/2020. (sgp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Doc. #5 ). Response to Notice of Appeal (Doc. #2 ) due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/6/2020. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Bankruptcy Appeal by Nancy J. Gargula. (Triebold, Ellen)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen L. Triebold on behalf of Nancy J. Gargula (Triebold, Ellen)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Court hereby finds that under the logic of Smith v. Check-n-Go, 200 F.3d 511 (7th Cir. 1999), given the similarities between this case and UpRight Law et al v. Gargula, Case No. 20-cv-1006 SMY, this case should be reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear case 20-1018-SMY. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/5/2020. (jdh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-31596, filed by UpRight Law, Tiffany L. Cannon. Appellant Brief due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information Sheet)(rah)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1018-JPG. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (rah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UpRight Law et al v. Gargula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy J. Gargula
Represented By: Mark D. Skaggs
Represented By: Ellen L. Triebold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tiffany L. Cannon
Represented By: Ronald A. Buch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UpRight Law
Represented By: Mark T. Lavery
Represented By: Charles A. Armgardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?