VZD, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: VZD, LLC d/b/a Maverick's Slots and VZD, LLC doing business as Maverick's Slots
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01046
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - Cin Fin webpage, #2 Exhibit I - Goodwill v PIIC)(Reid, Brian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Baniak on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company (Baniak, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by VZD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crompton, R.)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 1046. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 11/3/2020. (cds)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 1:30 PM and Presumptive Trial Month is set for February, 2022 both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 11/3/2020. (cds)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-1046-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Reid, Brian) Modified on 11/3/2020 (ack).
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kls3)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: VZD, LLC and Cincinnati Insurance Company was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, VZD, LLC and Cincinnati Insurance Company shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 11/3/2020 (ack)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Reid, Brian)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CDC Guidance, #2 Exhibit B - EPA List N, #3 Exhibit C - CDC Cleaning Guidance, #4 Exhibit D - Its Nice, #5 Exhibit E - Oral Surgeons, #6 Exhibit F - Gavrilides, #7 Exhibit G - Social LIfe)(Reid, Brian)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Reid, Brian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1046-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 10/26/2020 (ack)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Reid on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Reid, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL COVER SHEET (Reid, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Madison County, IL, case number 2020L001242 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4296752), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Madison County Complaint, #2 Exhibit service documents)(Reid, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VZD, LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VZD, LLC d/b/a Maverick's Slots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VZD, LLC doing business as Maverick's Slots
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Represented By: Ann E. Callis
Represented By: R. Seth Crompton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian M. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian M. Reid
Represented By: Michael Paul Baniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?