Laures v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sage Laures
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Direct Auto Illinois Farmers Insurance Company and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company doing business as Progressive Universal Insurance Company doing business as Progressive Direct Auto Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01047
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand - Unopposed filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Doc. #18 ). Response to MOTION to Remand (Doc. #15 ) due by 12/14/2020. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/23/2020. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand - Unopposed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Scott, Russell)
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #15 Motion to Remand filed by Sage Laures. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Sage Laures. (Giacoletto, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Sage Laures. Responses due by 12/3/2020 (Giacoletto, Steven)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle and Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-1047-SMY. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Giacoletto, Steven)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Winquist on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Winquist, Justin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Casie D. Collignon on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Collignon, Casie)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin T. Winquist on behalf of Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before December 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/8/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Doc 1-1 (Unopposed) by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Scott, Russell)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin T. Winquist $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4302116 by on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Winquist, Justin)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Casie D. Collignon on behalf of Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Casie D Collignon $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4301429 by on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Collignon, Casie)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Sage Laures, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1047-MAB. Consent due by 10/26/2020 (amv)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Direct Auto Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Universal Insurance Company. (Scott, Russell)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell K. Scott on behalf of All Defendants (Scott, Russell)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 20-L-0641 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4296888), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laures v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Laures
Represented By: Steven C. Giacoletto
Represented By: Lloyd A Cueto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Direct Auto Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company doing business as Progressive Universal Insurance Company doing business as Progressive Direct Auto Illinois Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Justin T. Winquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?