Beamon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Adrian Beamon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01091
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Beamon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Office of Regional Counsel 10/21/20)(Pavisian, James)
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Beamon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Atty General 10/26/20)(Pavisian, James)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Beamon. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 10/22/20)(Pavisian, James)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn no longer assigned to the case. (trb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pavisian, James) unsealed on 10/29/2020 (trb).
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) unsealed on 10/29/2020 (trb).
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: In a continued effort to equalize the distribution of cases in this judicial district (see Administrative Order No. 277), effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed before the filing of Defendants brief. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. Magistrate Judge Beatty no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 20-1091-SPM.(mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (trb)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pavisian, James) unsealed on 10/29/2020 (trb).
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1091-SPM-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (trb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Pavisian on behalf of Adrian Beamon (Pavisian, James)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4308324.), filed by Adrian Beamon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pavisian, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beamon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Beamon
Represented By: James Pavisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?