Parmeley v Trump et al
Plaintiff: Jason Parmeley
Defendant: William Barr, Adam Cohen, Williams, M. D. Carvajal and Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 3:2020cv01092
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 This Court has received your complaint/petition (and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee) from the Western District of Arkansas, previously assigned case number: 12-1050. Your new case number is 20-1092-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court will now review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/16/2020. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 10/16/2020. Consent due by 11/6/2020 (jaj)
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-01050. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Southern Illinois. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 14, 2020. (cnn) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address for Jason Parmeley. There are no documents to resend. (cnn) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered the need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual and legal complexity of the case, and whether Plaintiff has the ability to investigate and present this case. In considering these factors, the Court finds that the claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and Plaintiff is adequately prosecuting this case at this time. The Court finds Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel. At a later stage in the case, Plaintiff may again request appointment of counsel if Plaintiff believes the circumstances justify such an appointment. In addition, each Plaintiffs' applications to proceed in forma pauperis have been denied and the filing fees have not been paid. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 7, 2020. (mlf) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 22 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
September 18, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from District of Columbia. (cnn) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01290. Docket sheet received. [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER FORTHWITH to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas #19 Plaintiff Marco Guirlandos Emergency Motion/Memorandum In Support of (TRO) Preliminary Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/16/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #17 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Waiver, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion to Compel, filed by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to File; denying #6 Motion for Waiver; denying #7 Motion for Leave to File; denying #9 Motion to Expedite; denying #13 Motion to Compel. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/25/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/19/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #11 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(eg). Document already filed as docket entry #12 . Modified on 8/13/2020 (zsb). [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marco Guirlando, #2 Affidavit Jason Parmeley, #3 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite by MARCO GUIRLANDO, JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #5 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by MARCO GUIRLANDO. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave by JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Waive Requirement of PLRA by JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/22/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave by JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARCO GUIRLANDO (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JASON PARMELEY (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, M. D. CARVAJAL, ADAM COHEN, RICHARD MITCHAM, DONALD J. TRUMP, WILLIAMS filed by JASON PARMELEY, MARCO GUIRLANDO.(zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/14/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 9/18/2020.] [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parmeley v Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Parmeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. D. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?