Sparks v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Sparks
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv01131
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1131-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 11/17/2020 (kdw)
October 27, 2020 Filing 59 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-28235. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2020 Filing 58 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8234) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 57 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8060) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8205) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 56 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8041) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8191) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 55 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2003) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2004) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2175) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2240) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2469) - Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2470) - Pls' Mem in Support of Amended Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2618) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2925) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8033) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8201) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 54 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2022) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2024) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2179) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2921) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2982) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7987) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8229) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7980) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8142) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8053) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8156) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8062) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8164) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2128) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2128) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2129) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2202) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2286) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8040) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8139) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Allen Garely.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 49 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #46 Response In Opposition. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE and Memorandum of Law by Mary Sparks in opposition to #43 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C)(Goss, Tim) (Modified on 5/28/2019 to remove link to #44 Memorandum in Support)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE and Memorandum in Opposition by Mary Sparks to #41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Goss, Tim) (Modified on 5/24/2019 to remove link to #42 Memorandum in Support) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 12, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #43 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 12, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-F)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-G)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on 4/27/19 at 11:30 a.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on 4/27/19 at 12:00 p.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on dates and times to be determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on 4/27/19 at 12:00 p.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #34 Notice of Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 4/2/2019 to add link to #34)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Sparks for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Sparks on 02/27/19 at 11:00 a.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Second Amended Notice of Video Deposition of Mary Sparks by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter de la Cerda, Kevin L. Edwards, Yvette Diaz, William F. Blankenship III, Drew Warren, and Courtney Capshaw on behalf of Mary Sparks. (Goss, Tim) (Modified on 2/19/2019 to list attorneys)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Sparks on 02/21/19 at 1:00 p.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 28 SECONDED AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Mary Sparks of Michael Schultheis, M.D. on March 27, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Central Standard Time) (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Mary Sparks of Michael Schultheis, M.D. on February 19, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Central Standard Time) (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Sparks on 02/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Sparks on 2/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. (MST) (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 12/27/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #21, #22 and #23 Certificates of Service. ERROR: Incorrect images attached. CORRECTION: Incorrect images removed. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 INCORRECT IMAGE; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 12/20/2018 to remove incorrect image) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 INCORRECT IMAGE; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 12/20/2018 to remove incorrect image) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 INCORRECT IMAGE; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 12/20/2018 to remove incorrect image) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Mary Sparks. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Mary Sparks of Michael Schultheis, M.D. on 2/19/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Goss, Tim) (Modified on 11/7/2018 to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 320 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 10 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 10 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 10 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 10 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (drs) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 7/1/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 2902 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/24/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kll) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting MOTION by Tim K. Goss, Tamara L. Banno, John Harloe, Yvette Diaz and Freese & Goss, PLLC for Change of Address filed in MDL 2327. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the firm address, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Tim K. Goss, Tamara L. Banno, John Harloe, and Yvette Diaz are associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER It is ORDERED that the #5 Plaintiffs' Waiver of Lexecon Objections and Motion for Trial Settings for Certain Plaintiffs of Freese & Goss and Matthews and Associates is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/11/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 7, 2015 Filing 7 REPLY by Mary Sparks to #6 Response In Opposition. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
July 31, 2015 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #5 MOTION by Mary Sparks for Trial Settings for Certain Plaintiffs of Freese & Goss and Matthews and Associates (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
July 22, 2015 Filing 5 WAIVER OF LEXECON OBJECTIONS and MOTION by Mary Sparks for Trial Settings for Certain Plaintiffs of Freese & Goss and Matthews and Associates (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 24, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 154 (Final Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 11/14/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 16, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3530268. (Severed from Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-27074) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sparks
Represented By: Tim K Goss
Represented By: William F Blankenship, III
Represented By: Drew Warren
Represented By: Richard Arthur Freese
Represented By: Yvette Diaz
Represented By: Kevin L Edwards
Represented By: Peter de la Cerda
Represented By: Courtney Capshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?