Porter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Henry Porter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01142
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Porter. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Van Fossan. (lmb)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. If Plaintiff wishes for the United States Marshals Service to serve process in this action, instructions for requesting assistance are provided within. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 11/10/2020. (kll)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1142-DWD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen N. Van Fossan on behalf of Henry Porter (Van Fossan, Kristen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Henry Porter. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Henry Porter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Andrew Saul, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Steven D Weinhoeft)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Porter
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?