Eason v. Pritzker et al
Plaintiff: Hannibal Dwan Eason
Defendant: Jane Doe 1, Wexford, J. B. Pritzker, Rob Jeffreys, Menard Correctional Center, Allen Pasley, John Doe 1 and Unknown Party
Case Number: 3:2020cv01157
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION Leave that court Permit Herein and all Availed to Jeffreys be Incorporated in Jeffreys 2/1/21 Response by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (jaj)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Refile the Motion for Orders and for Attached Exhibits to be Allowed by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (Attachments: #1 part 2)(jaj)
December 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Rob Jeffreys to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Rob Jeffreys on 12/18/2020. Consent due by 1/8/2021 (kek)
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheree A. Davis on behalf of Rob Jeffreys (Davis, Sheree)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Copy (Doc. #13 ) expressing confusion over the Request for Waiver (Doc. 10) and the Waiver of Service Returned Executed (Doc. 12) and asking for copies of the documents. Because Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis was granted, the Court conducts service of process on his behalf. Under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a defendant may waive personal service, meaning that the defendant accepts a copy of the complaint by mail rather than by personal service of process. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). In accordance with Rule 4, the Clerk of Court sent to Defendant Jeffreys a Waiver of Service of Summons and a copy of the Complaint. (Doc. 9, p. 11). Because Jeffreys has returned the form, he has been successfully served. The answer date indicated on the docket is the date for Defendant Jeffreys to file an Answer to the Complaint. Currently, there are no deadlines pending that apply to Plaintiff. As stated in the merit review order, once Defendant Jeffreys has filed an Answer to the Complaint, the Court will enter a Scheduling Order containing important information on deadlines, discovery, and procedures. As a general rule, the District Clerk will mail paper copies of any document only after receiving prepayment of the required fee of $0.50 per page. This rule applies even to plaintiffs who are proceeding in forma pauperis. See Hoffman v. Hertz, No. 15-cv-00289-MJR, 2015 WL 1598078 at *2 (S.D. Ill. Apr. 8, 2015). A request for documents should be made in writing to the Clerk of Court by referring to the case number and the document number and submitting the required prepayment. Accordingly, the request for copies is DENIED. Plaintiff has also filed motions for the Court to provide further information regarding the merit review order and for a temporary restraining order. (Docs. #15 , #17 ). Plaintiff has, however, failed to sign the pleadings and so, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to STRIKE Docs. 15 and 17. Rule 11 requires every that "Every pleading, written motion, and other paper must be signed... by a party personally if the party is unrepresented." Plaintiff may refiled the motions, but they must be properly signed. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to return the original or a copy of Docs. 15 and 17 to Plaintiff along with this order. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/11/2020. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 STRICKEN Per ORDER at doc 18- MOTION for Copy of Order #9 from 11/30/2020 and Transcript, if available, by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (jaj) Modified on 12/14/2020 (kdw).
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #14 Motion to Copy filed by Hannibal Dwan Eason. Duplicate filing of Doc. #13 . (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 STRICKEN per Order at doc 18- MOTION for the Court's Order and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (tjk) Modified on 12/14/2020 (kdw).
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY STRICKEN: MOTION for Copy by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (tjk) Modified on 12/8/2020 (tjk).
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Copy by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (jaj)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Rob Jeffreys waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (tjk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 25.00 received, receipt number 44625013585 (tba)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jeffreys on 12/1/2020. Waiver of Service due by 1/4/2021. (tjk)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Complaint survives preliminary review pursuant to Section 1915A. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve process on Defendant Jeffreys in accordance with this Order. Defendants Pritzker, Pasley, John and Jane Does IDOC Administration, Wexford, Menard Correctional Center, and Unknown Party John and Jane Does are DISMISSED without prejudice. The #3 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel and the #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/30/2020. (jrj)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (jaj)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $25.00. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/10/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 20-1157-SPM. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 11/2/2020. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 11/2/2020. Consent due by 11/23/2020 (jaj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (jaj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (jaj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hannibal Dwan Eason. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 Cover Sheet)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannibal Dwan Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Represented By: Sheree A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Pasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?