Simmons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephen R. Simmons
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01160
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison for final disposition. Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. (kek)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Sellers, Joseph) Unsealed on 11/23/2020 (kek).
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Unsealed on 11/23/2020 (kek).
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. Document stricken at request of the filer and corrected document will be filed. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN - CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 11/19/2020 (kek).
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Sellers. (kek)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1160-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kek)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Sellers on behalf of Stephen R. Simmons (Sellers, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Sellers, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by Stephen R. Simmons. Supplement to #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet). (Sellers, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4324146.), filed by Stephen R. Simmons.(Sellers, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen R. Simmons
Represented By: Joseph S. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?