Pepper v. USA
Petitioner: Steven Leslie Pepper
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv01161
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34625105250 (ack)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) based on the financial information provided with his motion. Petitioner's trust fund account balance as of October 21, 2020 was $254.45, which is sufficient to cover the $5.00 filing fee. Accordingly, Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee in this case not later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order. Payment of the $5.00 filing fee shall be sent to: United States District Court, Clerks Office, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois, 62201. At the time payment is made, Petitioner's name and the case number assigned to this action shall be clearly identified. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/5/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 20-1161-JPG. The following is important information concerning the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined the Court will review your petition to determine whether it survives preliminary review under Rule 4 and Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in an Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you do not receive a preliminary review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the Court has completed the preliminary review of your petition. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). In the event your petition survives the preliminary review, the Court will instruct the respondent to file a response to the petition and you will be notified of your deadline to file a reply. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/2/2020. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Leslie Pepper. (jaj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven Leslie Pepper.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepper v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Leslie Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?