Baxmeyer Construction, Inc. v. U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Baxmeyer Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC d/b/a Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite and U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC doing business as Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite
Counter Claimant: U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01170
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATED ESI PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/29/2020. (tlp)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery due by 12/7/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/13/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 4/25/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Affirmative Defenses to U.S. Composite Pipe South by Baxmeyer Construction, Inc..(Strellis, Jack)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to the Complaint by All Defendants , COUNTERCLAIM by U.S. Composite Pipe South LLC. (Only) against Baxmeyer Construction, Inc. by Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC. (Roth, Robert)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/13/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 4/25/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC, U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc..(Roth, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1170-JPG. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Strellis, Jack)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack A. Strellis on behalf of Baxmeyer Construction, Inc. (Strellis, Jack)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Jack Strellis does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baxmeyer Construction, Inc.. (Strellis, Jack)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Baxmeyer Construction, Inc., Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC, and U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1170-RJD. Consent due by 11/30/2020 (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC d/b/a Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite, U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc.. (Roth, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Roth on behalf of Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC d/b/a Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite, U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc. (Roth, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC d/b/a Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite, U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal. (Roth, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 2020L0761 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4326731), filed by Thompson Pipe Group Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc., U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC d/b/a Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint from State Court, #2 Exhibit B- Van Malkenhorst Jr. Declaration)(Roth, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxmeyer Construction, Inc. v. U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Pipe Group Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Composite Pipe, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC d/b/a Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite
Represented By: Robert A. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC doing business as Thompson Pipe Group-Flowtite
Represented By: Robert A. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baxmeyer Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Jack A. Strellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: U.S. Composite Pipe South, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?