Greer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: JENNETTA F. GREER
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01272
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Matthew F. Richter. (lmb)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/14/2020. (dah)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Summons Issued. Summons issued prematurely. Motion for IFP is still pending. (ack)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Matthew F. Richter. (ack) Modified on 12/1/2020 (ack).
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1272-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (ack)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F. Richter on behalf of JENNETTA F. GREER (Richter, Matthew)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JENNETTA F. GREER. (Richter, Matthew)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by JENNETTA F. GREER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney S.D. ILL, #4 Summons SSA OGC, #5 USM 285- U.S. Attorney General, #6 USM 285- U.S. Attorney S.D. ILL, #7 USM 285- SSA OGC)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNETTA F. GREER
Represented By: Matthew F. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?