Karnes v. Bank of Whittington et al
Plaintiff: Giasemi N. Karnes
Defendant: Mohammad Ardehali, Bank of Whittington and City of Benton
Case Number: 3:2020cv01288
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Giasemi N. Karnes. (lmb)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENTS. The Complaint (Doc. #3 ) and Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ) by Plaintiff Giasemi N. Karnes are STRICKEN for improper signature. As per page 10 of Administrative Order 266, the Court will accept filings from pro se litigants via email that comply with these requirements: (a) the filing must be in PDF format; (b) the filing must be signed s/ [filers name] or bear a handwritten signature; (c) the email must be sent to ProSeFiling@ilsd.uscourts.gov; (d) the email must state the party's name, address, and phone number; (e) for existing cases, the email's subject line must read: Pro Se Filing [Insert Your Case Number], and for new cases, the email's subject line must read: Pro Se Filing in New Case. Emails that do not comply with these requirements will not be reviewed and will not be considered a proper filing. The Plaintiff has until January 27, 2021 to resubmit a signed Complaint and Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is WARNED that the failure to file a properly signed complaint as directed may result in dismissal of this action in its entirety for want of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to strike Doc. #3 and Doc. #4 . Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/28/2020. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Giasemi N. Karnes. Per Rule 4, the summons were not signed by a representative of the Clerk of Court and did not contain the Court's seal. In addition, the Motion for In forma Pauperis is currently still pending. Efiler is instructed to resubmit the summons once the motion has been ruled on. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN-SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giasemi N. Karnes. Mohammad Ardehali served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; Bank of Whittington served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021; City of Benton served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(jlrr) Modified on 12/22/2020 (jlrr).
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING FILINGS re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Complaint, and #5 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge, as per page 10 of Administrative Order 266 outlining the requirements for pro-se filings submitted via email, the filings must be signed s/ [filers name] or bear a handwritten signature. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (mar)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Giasemi N. Karnes. (ack) Modified on 12/29/2020 (kdw).
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Giasemi N. Karnes. (Attachments: #1 Summary)(ack) Modified on 12/29/2020 (kdw).
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Giasemi N. Karnes to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Giasemi N. Karnes on 12/3/2020. Consent due by 12/28/2020 (ack)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-1288-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (ack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karnes v. Bank of Whittington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Ardehali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giasemi N. Karnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?