Laney v. Second Chance Auto, Inc.
Appellant: Ryan L Laney
Appellee: Second Chance Auto, Inc.
Interested Party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Case Number: 3:2020cv01312
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Ryan L Laney. Appellee Brief due by 1/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Required Document in Record, #2 Appendix Relevant Statutes)(Dunham, Darrell)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis W. Martin on behalf of Second Chance Auto, Inc. (Martin, Curtis)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-40789 filed by Ryan L Laney. Appellant Brief due by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Information Sheet)(tba)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1312-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laney v. Second Chance Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ryan L Laney
Represented By: Darrell W. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Second Chance Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Represented By: US Bankruptcy Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?