Lee v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica M. Lee
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01316
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc. 23 sent to Peyton Patrick Murphy was returned. (kls3)
January 11, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Georgia as case 1:21-cv-00132, filed 01/11/2021. (kls3)
January 8, 2021 Filing 26 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Georgia, Judge Leigh Martin May, pursuant to MDL Transfer Order (MDL 1974). (kls3)
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1 / MDL 2974) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Cover Transmission)(kls3)
January 7, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing All Defendants to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to All Defendants on 1/7/21. Consent due by 1/28/2021 (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 7, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC. Original mailed to Attorney Peyton Patrick Murphy for service.(ack)
January 6, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coopersurgical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Cooper Companies, Inc. for Coopersurgical, Inc.. (Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by The Cooper Companies, Inc..(Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Coopersurgical, Inc..(Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Booker T. Coleman, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Coleman, Booker)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Requested. (Murphy, Peyton)
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Requested. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) as assigned by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (kls3)
December 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica M. Lee. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica M. Lee. Teva Women's Health, LLC served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica M. Lee. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica M. Lee. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica M. Lee. Coopersurgical, Inc. served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peyton Patrick Murphy(ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peyton Patrick Murphy $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4356145 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Murphy, Peyton)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kassan, Randi)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC and The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Summons returned to attorney Kassan for service. (trb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Jessica M. Lee. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1316-RJD. Consent due by 12/30/2020 (ack)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Alyson Kassan on behalf of Jessica M. Lee (Kassan, Randi)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coopersurgical, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4352076.), filed by Jessica M. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC, #3 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #4 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health LLC)(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica M. Lee
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Peyton Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?