Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust et al v. K & F Electric, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Local 309 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Alton IBEW-NECA Health and Welfare Plan, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Pension Benefit Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Local 649 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Local 649 Sub Welfare Fund, Local 649 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee and Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Zak Companies, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc. and Franklin Mechanical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01350
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #20 Answer to Complaint filed by K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc. The party Franklin Mechanical, Inc. was omitted from the selection of filers. Docket text has been modified to indicate the Answer is also filed on behalf of Franklin Mechanical, Inc. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, // DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc., and Franklin Mechanical, Inc.(Lewis, Jordan) Modified on 2/8/2021 (kek).
January 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1350-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #17 Notice (Other) filed by Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc. Incorrect filing event used. Filer should have used the event "Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge" located under Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents. Docket text has been modified accordingly. No further action is required. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 21, 2021 Filing 17 FINAL CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties (Eggmann, Robert) Unsealed on 1/22/2021 (kek).
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., and Zak Companies, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., and Zak Companies, Inc. on 1/21/2021. Consent due by 2/11/2021 (kek)
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Set Aside by Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lewis, Jordan)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc. re #13 MOTION to Set Aside //WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT (Lewis, Jordan)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Set Aside by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lewis, Jordan)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Ross Lewis on behalf of Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc. (Lewis, Jordan)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Eggmann, III on behalf of Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc. (Eggmann, Robert)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #9 Clerk's Entry of Default. The PDF document was inadvertently omitted from the filing and has now been attached. Notice will be re-generated to the parties. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., and Zak Companies, Inc.(kek) (kek).
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Local 309 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 649 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Alton IBEW-NECA Health and Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the Local 649 Sub Welfare Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Local 649 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Pension Benefit Trust Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Teague, Natalie)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Franklin Mechanical, Inc. served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021; K & F Electric, Inc. served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021; Zak Companies, Inc. served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Teague, Natalie)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc., and Franklin Mechanical, Inc. and originals mailed to Attorney Teague. (kek)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Teague, Natalie) Unsealed on 1/22/2021 (kek).
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1350-MAB. Consent due by 1/8/2021 (kek)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert on behalf of Local 309 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 649 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Alton IBEW-NECA Health and Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Local 309 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the Local 649 Sub Welfare Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Local 649 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Pension Benefit Trust Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee (Leppert, Matthew)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie J. Teague on behalf of Local 309 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 649 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Alton IBEW-NECA Health and Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Local 309 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the Local 649 Sub Welfare Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Local 649 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Pension Benefit Trust Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee (Teague, Natalie)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franklin Mechanical, Inc., K & F Electric, Inc., Zak Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4359792.), filed by Local 309 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local 649 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Alton IBEW-NECA Health and Welfare Plan, Trustees of the Local 649 Sub Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Pension Benefit Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Local 649 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Directed to K & F Electric, Inc., #5 Summons Directed to Zak Companies, Inc., #6 Summons Directed to Franklin Mechanical, Inc.)(Teague, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust et al v. K & F Electric, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zak Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & F Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Represented By: Jordan Ross Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 309 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Alton IBEW-NECA Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Pension Benefit Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the NECA-IBEW Local 649 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 649 Sub Welfare Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 649 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?