Clark v. Snap Inc.
Plaintiff: Erin Clark
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00009
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims filed by Erin Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Driscoll, John)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims. For good cause shown, the joint motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by March 5, 2021. Defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed by March 12, 2021. At the request of the parties, the Court STAYS briefing on Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #27 ) pending the outcome of the motion to compel arbitration. Should the motion to compel arbitration (Doc. #25 ) be denied, Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed within 14 days of the Court's ruling on the question of arbitration. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/25/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Erin Clark. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 24, 2021 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims, #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Erin Clark. (Coleman, Gregory)
February 22, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Alborz Hassani on behalf of Snap Inc. (Hassani, Alborz)
February 22, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Zachary Zmick on behalf of Snap Inc. (Zmick, Tyler)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 11:00 AM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Parties will receive the appropriate Zoom invitation via email from the Court. The Joint Report of the Parties is due on or before 3/9/2021 and shall be submitted via email to DWDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/17/2021. (dmw2)
February 17, 2021 Filing 30 CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2023 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 2/13/2023 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David W. Dugan. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/17/2021. (dmw2)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/16/2021. (jjmc)
February 12, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Snap Inc.. Responses due by 3/18/2021 (Herrington, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims filed by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle Reynolds, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Claims by Snap Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #23 Motion for Protective Order filed by Snap Inc.. Proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed) by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F. Coleman on behalf of Erin Clark (Coleman, Gregory)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin J. Ruben on behalf of Plaintiff, Erin Clark. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin J. Ruben $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4390385 by on behalf of Erin Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Virginia Certificate of Good Standing)(Ruben, Erin)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Blake Yagman on behalf of Plaintiff, Erin Clark. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrei Rado on behalf of Plaintiff, Erin Clark. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Blake Hunter Yagman $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4386783 by on behalf of Erin Clark. (Yagman, Blake)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrei Rado $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4386758 by on behalf of Erin Clark. (Rado, Andrei)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-00009-DWD. (tba)
January 18, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Cohen, Jonathan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lee on behalf of Plaintiff Erin Clark. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew E. Lee $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4377111 by on behalf of Erin Clark. (Attachments: #1 NC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 FL Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, Matthew)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff, Erin Clark. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan B. Cohen $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4374297 by on behalf of Erin Clark. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Jonathan)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) filed by Snap Inc. Snap Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/12/2021. Action due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/8/2021. (lmo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Snap Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Snap Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Letter. Docket entry was entered in error. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 STRICKEN Letter to Attorney Rado, Yagman, Taylor, Ruben, Cohen, Grossman, and Lee regarding admission to SDIL. (tba) Modified on 1/7/2021 (tba).
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-00009-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 1/28/2021 (tba)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Snap Inc.. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth B. Herrington on behalf of Snap Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-L-156 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4371702), filed by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet S.D. Ill. Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Herrington
Represented By: Tyler Zachary Zmick
Represented By: Alborz Hassani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Clark
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Blake Hunter Yagman
Represented By: Matthew E. Lee
Represented By: Jonathan B. Cohen
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Erin J. Ruben
Represented By: Andrei Rado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?