Clarkson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Otis Clarkson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00099
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison for final disposition. Judge David W. Dugan no longer assigned to the case. (lmb)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified/unsealed on 2/18/2021 (lmb).
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Jennifer Van Fossan. (tba)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, Plaintiff's first motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/29/2021. (kll)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-99-DWD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (tba)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Van Fossan on behalf of Otis Clarkson (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Clarkson. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Otis Clarkson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons United States Attorney Summons, #3 Summons U S Attorney General, #4 Summons COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarkson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Clarkson
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?