Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00117
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for final disposition. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel no longer assigned to the case. (trb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Sutterfield, David) unsealed on 3/3/2021 (trb).
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) unsealed on 3/3/2021 (trb).
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (amv)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Sutterfield. (kek)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-117-NJR. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kek)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Sutterfield on behalf of Bryan Williams (Sutterfield, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4392263.), filed by Bryan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interest, #3 Summons)(Sutterfield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Represented By: David W. Sutterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?