Wyhs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wyhs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00132
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn no longer assigned to the case. (lmb)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified/unsealed on 3/5/2021 (lmb).
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Van Fossan. (jlrr)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A court may permit a plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis where the plaintiff has demonstrated indigence. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Nevertheless, a court can dismiss a qualified plaintiff's case if the action is clearly frivolous or malicious. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court finds that Plaintiff Wyhs' affidavit demonstrates indigence. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Wyhs' #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Additionally, in Wyhs' Complaint, she states that she seeks review of a decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration as permitted under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Accordingly, the Court finds nothing in the file to indicate that this action is frivolous or malicious. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 2/10/2021. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION. It has been brought to the attention of the Clerk that the party SSAOGC that was added to this case as an interested party was not the proper party linked with an email address. The result was that the SSAOGC has not received notice of any documents filed in this case. The party has been updated and sealed access given for every document to the correct party. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-132-SPM. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Wyhs. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Van Fossan on behalf of Jennifer Wyhs (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer Wyhs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons United States Attorney Summons, #3 Summons U S Attorney General, #4 Summons COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyhs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wyhs
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?