Sheikh v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shawn Sheikh
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00149
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for final disposition. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn no longer assigned to the case. (tba)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Kristen) Modified on 4/8/2021 (tba).
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Sheikh. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/24/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Kristen Van Fossan. (tba)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-149-SPM. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (tba)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen N. Van Fossan on behalf of Shawn Sheikh (Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4400180.), filed by Shawn Sheikh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons SSA Commissioner, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheikh v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Sheikh
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?