Duncan v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Plaintiff: Darren Duncan
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Bayer CropScience LP, Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Syngenta Corporation and Corteva Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00158
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(VanDorn, Erick)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM CST before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 75 Order. Incorrect hearing date given. Entry is stricken. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STRICKEN - ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/6/2021 at 9:30 AM CST before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 4/6/2021 (drb).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order of April 6, 2021, in Piper v. Bayer CropScience, LP, et al., No. 21-cv-21-NJR (Doc. 104), the #65 Motion to Stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants is DENIED. Defendants' alternative request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before April 27, 2021. A telephonic status conference will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (mlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 30, 2021 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #65 MOTION to Stay filed by Darren Duncan. (Lemire, Connor)
March 30, 2021 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Campbell, Travis)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING #70 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The Bayer CropScience Defendants may file a reply in support of their #41 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) on or before April 7, 2021. Replies due by 4/7/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/29/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2021 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 26, 2021 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Darren Duncan. (Lemire, Connor)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING #67 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Bayer CropScience, LP and Bayer CropScience Inc. on or before March 26, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/19/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Responses due by 3/26/2021 (ack)
March 18, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time Agreed Motion for Plaintiff to Respond to Bayer Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Darren Duncan. (Brandt, Derek)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #64 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. All current deadlines for Defendants to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint are VACATED. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint shall coincide with the Defendants' response deadline in Piper v. Bayer, et al., 3:21-CV-21-NJR (S.D. Ill.), either as set forth in the Court's Order of February 4, 2021 (Doc. 44), or as subsequently modified by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/15/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 13, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION to Stay by BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Nester, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Eric Mahr's #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2021 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 12, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Mahr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4426824 by on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 11, 2021 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (McCluggage, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Herbert Campbell on behalf of Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. (Campbell, Travis)
March 11, 2021 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corteva Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
March 11, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Syngenta Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Other Affiliate Syngenta AG for Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt D. Basil on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc. (Basil, Matt)
March 9, 2021 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Martin, Craig)
March 9, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig C. Martin on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc. (Martin, Craig)
March 9, 2021 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of BASF Corporation (Bozarth, Troy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr on behalf of Corteva Inc. (Flack, Donald)
March 8, 2021 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Tenkoz Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
March 8, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nester on behalf of Syngenta Corporation (Nester, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam Hemlock on behalf of Defendant, BASF Corporation. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam C. Hemlock $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4421039 by on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Hemlock, Adam)
March 5, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. McCluggage on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives Ltd. (McCluggage, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Kathy Osborn #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 5, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathy L. Osborn $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4420269 by on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 4, 2021 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winfield Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Land O'Lakes, Inc. for Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Eimer, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah H. Catalano on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Catalano, Sarah)
March 4, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Chang on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Chang, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa G Jacobsen on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC (Eimer, Nathan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ACTION re #31 Notice (Other). Several Attorneys who have not yet filed their entries of appearance have signed the Notice at Document #31 . See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. The following Attorneys do not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case: Travis Campbell, Michael Nester, Matt Basil, Michael McCluggage, Donald Flack, Nathan Eimer. In addition, Attorneys Adam Hemlock and Kathy Osborn are admitted to this Court Pro Hac Vice and should file their Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission in order to appear in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon B. Rosenberg on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Rosenberg, Sharon)
March 3, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE to 10 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,, Plaintiff's Response to Court's Feb. 17, 2021 Order and Request for Appointment of Derek Y. Brandt to Executive Committee filed by Darren Duncan. (Brandt, Derek)
March 3, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Hohn, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC re 10 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,, Notice of Filing Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff Piper's Motion to Consolidate and Appoint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Joint Response to Motion)(VanDorn, Erick)
March 3, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenkoz Inc.. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 3, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McCaffrey on behalf of Tenkoz Inc. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 3, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience LP identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience LP. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 3, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 3, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick E. VanDorn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 3, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Growmark Inc.. (Noeltner, Barry)
March 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry S. Noeltner on behalf of Growmark Inc. (Noeltner, Barry)
March 3, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
March 3, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Bayer CropScience, Inc. served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Bayer CropScience LP served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Univar Solutions, Inc. served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Syngenta Corporation served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Growmark Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Corteva Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. BASF Corporation served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Winfield Solutions, LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. CHS Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Duncan. Cargill Incorporated served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Brandt, Derek)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC; originals mailed to Attorney Brandt. (mar)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiffs in three related actions against the same Defendants, Piper v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al., Case No. 21-cv-21-NJR, Swanson v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al., Case No. 21-cv-46-NJR, and Lex v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al., Case No. 21-cv-122-NJR, seek consolidation of those cases and any subsequently filed related cases. They further seek the appointment of a four-firm Executive Committee as interim lead Plaintiffs' counsel (see Case No. 21-cv-21, Doc. 53). Because this action involves a common question of law or fact, the Court is considering consolidation of this case with the above-referenced actions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). If the parties have any objection to consolidation or to the appointment of an Executive Committee, they shall inform the Court, in writing, on or before March 3, 2021. (Action due by 3/3/2021.) Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/17/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Chief District Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. (lmb)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is before the Court sua sponte for case management purposes. This case is related to another case presently before Chief Judge Rosenstengel (See SDIL case number 21-cv-00021-NJR) The Seventh Circuit has emphasized that related cases filed within the same court should be transferred to (or consolidated before) a single judge in order to promote judicial economy and efficiency and avoid the unnecessary duplication of efforts. See, e.g. Smith v. Check-N-Go of Illinois, Inc., 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999); Blair v. Equifax Check Services, Inc., 181 F.3d 832, 839 (7th Cir. 1999). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REASSIGN this case to Chief Judge Rosenstengel. All future documents filed in this matter shall bear the case number 21-cv-00158-NJR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 2/12/2021. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Brandt, Derek)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Darren Duncan. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-158-MAB. Consent due by 3/5/2021 (kls3)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor P. Lemire on behalf of Darren Duncan (Lemire, Connor)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh M. Perica on behalf of Darren Duncan (Perica, Leigh)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Y. Brandt on behalf of Darren Duncan (Brandt, Derek)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4400749.), filed by Darren Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Brandt, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Travis Herbert Campbell
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Represented By: Barry S. Noeltner
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. McCaffrey
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Vanessa G Jacobsen
Represented By: Sarah H. Catalano
Represented By: Brian Chang
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Duncan
Represented By: Leigh M. Perica
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Represented By: Connor P. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?