Jones Planting Co. III v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al.
Plaintiff: Jones Planting Co. III
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Bayer CropScience LP, Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Corteva Inc. and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00173
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING #39 Motion to Stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants. Defendants' alternative request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before April 27, 2021. A telephonic status conference will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (mlp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond filed by All Defendants. (Nester, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall P. Ewing, Jr on behalf of Jones Planting Co. III (Ewing, Randall)
March 29, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #58 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Jones Planting Co. III. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Ewing does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case, and is again reminded to file his Notice of Appearance as soon as possible. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2021 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond filed by Jones Planting Co. III. (Ewing, Randall)
March 19, 2021 Filing 57 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., and Winfield Solutions, LLC. Originals returned to Attorney Barrett for service. (kls3)
March 18, 2021 Filing 56 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 55 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 54 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 53 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 52 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 51 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 50 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 49 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 48 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 47 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 46 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 45 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 44 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 43 Summons Requested. (Garvey, Karin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF ACTION re #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Jones Planting Co. III. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Ewing does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Bayer CropScience, LP and Bayer CropScience Inc. on or before March 24, 2021. Responses due by 3/24/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/17/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 17, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Bayer CropScience Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) by Jones Planting Co. III. (Ewing, Randall)
March 12, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond by Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric J. Mahr on behalf of Defendant Cargill Incorporated. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2021 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 12, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Mahr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4426842 by on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 11, 2021 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Syngenta Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Other Affiliate Syngenta AG for Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corteva Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
March 11, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nester on behalf of Syngenta Corporation (Nester, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent E.I du Pont de Nemours & Company (DuPont), Other Affiliate Corteva, Inc. for Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
March 11, 2021 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenkoz Inc.. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McCaffrey on behalf of Tenkoz Inc. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr on behalf of Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. (Flack, Donald)
March 9, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 9, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of BASF Corporation (Bozarth, Troy)
March 8, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr on behalf of Corteva Inc. (Flack, Donald)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy L. Osborn on behalf of Defendant CHS, Inc. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 5, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathy L. Osborn $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4420248 by on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy)
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Barrett, Charles)
March 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #20 Notice Requesting Consent. Document stricken as it was entered in error. Case was transferred to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 3, 2021 Filing 20 STRICKEN. NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Growmark, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Growmark, Inc. on 3/3/2021. Consent due by 3/24/2021 (kls3) Modified on 3/4/2021 (kls3).
March 3, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Growmark Inc.. (Noeltner, Barry)
March 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry S. Noeltner on behalf of Growmark Inc. (Noeltner, Barry)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karin Elizabeth Garvey, and granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Scott Crevier, both on behalf of Plaintiff Jones Planting Co. III. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Scott Crevier $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4411463 by on behalf of Jones Planting Co. III. (Crevier, Jonathan)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karin Elizabeth Garvey $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4411440 by on behalf of Jones Planting Co. III. (Garvey, Karin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jones Planting Co. III. Login used and signature do not match. Attorney must first apply for pro hac registration. Please refer to instructions for pro hac registration on www.ilsd.uscourts.gov. Also striking #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: This document is stricken as it is a duplicate of the document filed at Doc. #12 .(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 STRICKEN. MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles F. Barrett by on behalf of Jones Planting Co. III. (Barrett, Charles) Modified on 2/19/2021 (kls3).
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 STRICKEN. MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles F. Barrett by on behalf of Jones Planting Co. III. (Barrett, Charles) Modified on 2/19/2021 (kls3).
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #10 Complaint filed by Jones Planting Co. III. Text entry modified to more accurately describe the attached document as an Exhibit to the Complaint / Civil Cover Sheet, instead of a Complaint against all defendants. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBIT to #8 Complaint: Civil Cover Sheet filed by Jones Planting Co. III.(Barrett, Charles) Modified on 2/19/2021 (kls3).
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ACTION re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Jones Planting Co. III.The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. Filer is required to file the Civil Cover Sheet.NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Jones Planting Co. III. New defendants should have been added at the time of filing the Amended Complaint. Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. has been added by the Clerk's Office; therefore, no further action is required by the filer in regard to adding new defendants.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action Consolidated Complaint against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Barrett, Charles)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barrett, Charles)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Complaint filed by Jones Planting Co. III. Login used and signature do not match. Filer will re-file document as an Amended Complaint with the login and signature matching.THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.(kls3)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is before the Court sua sponte for case management purposes. This case is related to another case presently before Chief Judge Rosenstengel (See SDIL case number 21-cv-00021-NJR). The Seventh Circuit has emphasized that related cases filed within the same court should be transferred to (or consolidated before) a single judge in order to promote judicial economy and efficiency and avoid the unnecessary duplication of efforts. See, e.g. Smith v. Check-N-Go of Illinois, Inc., 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999); Blair v. Equifax Check Services, Inc., 181 F.3d 832, 839 (7th Cir. 1999). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REASSIGN this case to Chief Judge Rosenstengel. All future documents filed in this matter shall bear the case number 21-cv-00173-NJR. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 2/17/2021. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 STRICKEN. COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jones Planting Co. III.(Boyer, Jamie) Modified on 2/17/2021 (kls3).
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry.NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Barrett does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Jones Planting Co. III. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-173-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 3/5/2021 (kls3)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4402053.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Barrett, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones Planting Co. III v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Represented By: Barry S. Noeltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones Planting Co. III
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Karin Elizabeth Garvey
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Crevier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?