Vienna Eqho Farms v. Bayer Cropscience Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vienna Eqho Farms
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., Bayer CropScience LP, Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply, Corteva Inc., BASF Corporation, CHS Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Cargill, Incorporated, Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Bayer Cropscience Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply agent of FS and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Interested Party: Barbara Piper
Case Number: 3:2021cv00204
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 71 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Docket text modified to remove "Signed by Unassigned." No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan W. Cuneo. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 20, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan W. Cuneo $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4457997 by on behalf of Vienna Eqho Farms. (Cuneo, Jonathan)
April 20, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/6/2021 09:30 AM with Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (drb)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Hearing as to 69 Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) as to case 21-cv-21-NJR is SET for 5/13/2021 at 1:30 PM via video teleconference before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Full access to this hearing is available remotely to the public. Instructions to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 1-877-336-1831, when prompted enter Access Code 9139610. Information as to the video conference will be sent by email to all counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/19/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Victoria R. Sims. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 7, 2021 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(VanDorn, Erick)
April 7, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victoria R. Sims $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4448065 by on behalf of Vienna Eqho Farms. (Sims, Victoria)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/6/2021 at 9:30 AM CST before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 63 Order. Incorrect hearing date given. Entry is stricken. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STRICKEN - ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/6/2021 at 9:30 AM CST before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 4/6/2021 (drb).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order of April 6, 2021, in Piper v. Bayer CropScience, LP, et al., No. 21-cv-21-NJR (Doc. 104), the #46 Motion to Stay Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants is DENIED. Defendants' alternative request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before April 27, 2021. A telephonic status conference will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2021. (mlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #60 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The Bayer CropScience Defendants may file a reply in support of their #31 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) on or before April 7, 2021. Replies due by 4/7/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/29/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 26, 2021 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 25, 2021 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Vienna Eqho Farms. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #53 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. All current deadlines for Defendants to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint are VACATED. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint shall coincide with the Defendants' response deadline in Piper v. Bayer, et al., 3:21-CV-21-NJR (S.D. Ill.), either as set forth in the Court's Order of February 4, 2021 (Doc. 44), or as subsequently modified by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/18/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Barrett Riley. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #52 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendants Bayer CropScience, LP and Bayer CropScience Inc. on or before March 25, 2021. Responses due by 3/25/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/18/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 17, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Barbara Piper. (Boyer, Jamie)
March 17, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine Barrett Riley $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4431273 by on behalf of Vienna Eqho Farms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Katherine)
March 17, 2021 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 17, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Ds' Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) by Vienna Eqho Farms. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 17, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt D. Basil on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc. (Basil, Matt)
March 17, 2021 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Martin, Craig)
March 17, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig C. Martin on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc. (Martin, Craig)
March 16, 2021 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy)
March 16, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of BASF Corporation (Bozarth, Troy)
March 12, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Or, In the Alternative, For an Extension of Time to Respond by Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Eric J. Mahr #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2021 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill, Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 12, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Mahr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4426865 by on behalf of Cargill, Incorporated. (Mahr, Eric)
March 11, 2021 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Syngenta Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Other Affiliate Syngenta AG for Syngenta Corporation. (Nester, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nester on behalf of Syngenta Corporation (Nester, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corteva Inc.. (Flack, Donald)
March 11, 2021 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenkoz Inc.. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McCaffrey on behalf of Tenkoz Inc. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #36 Notice of Appearance filed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Incorrect party selected. Filer shall refile the document and select Defendant Tenkoz as the party filer instead of Vienna Eqho Farms. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 11, 2021 Filing 36 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy McCaffrey on behalf of Vienna Eqho Farms (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr on behalf of Corteva Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. (Flack, Donald)
March 5, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc. (Hohn, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon B. Rosenberg on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc. (Rosenberg, Sharon)
March 4, 2021 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience LP identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience LP. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Cropscience Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick E. VanDorn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc. (VanDorn, Erick)
March 4, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 3, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Growmark, Inc.. (Noeltner, Barry)
March 3, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry S. Noeltner on behalf of Growmark, Inc. (Noeltner, Barry)
March 2, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vienna Eqho Farms. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of John W. Barrett In Support of Motion)(Barrett, John (Don))
March 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Vienna Eqho Farms. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 2, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Tenkoz Inc. served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Judge David W. Dugan no longer assigned to the case per Order at (Doc. 19). All future filings shall bear case number 21-204-NJR. (amv)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is before the Court sua sponte for case management purposes. This action is closely related to other actions currently pending before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel, including Case Nos. 21-cv-21, 21-cv-122, 21-cv-158, 21-cv-173, and 21-cv-181. The Seventh Circuit has emphasized that related cases filed within the same court should be transferred to, or consolidated before, a single judge to promote judicial economy and efficiency and to avoid the unnecessary duplication of efforts. See, e.g., Smith v. Check-N-Go of Illinois, Inc. 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999); Blair v. Equifax Check Services, Inc., 181 F.3d 832, 839 (7th Cir. 1999). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reassign this case to Chief Judge Rosenstengel for all future proceedings. All future documents filed in this matter shall bear the case number 21-cv-204-NJR. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 3/1/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Winfield Solutions, LLC served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. CHS Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Cargill, Incorporated served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Univar Solutions, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Syngenta Corporation served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Growmark, Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Corteva Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Bayer CropScience LP served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. Bayer Cropscience Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vienna Eqho Farms. BASF Corporation served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Barrett, John (Don))
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-204-DWD. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Sterling Starns $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4410167 by on behalf of Vienna Eqho Farms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Starns, Sarah)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Barrett, John (Don))
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John (Don) W. Barrett on behalf of Vienna Eqho Farms (Barrett, John (Don))
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer Cropscience Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill, Incorporated, Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., Growmark, Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. Original mailed to counsel for service. (amv)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Vienna Eqho Farms. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-204-RJD. Consent due by 3/16/2021 (amv)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4409213.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment, #2 Summons BASF Corporation, #3 Summons Bayer CropScience Incorporated, #4 Summons Bayer CropScience LP, #5 Summons Cargill, Inc, #6 Summons CHS Incorporated, #7 Summons Corteva Inc, #8 Summons Federated Co-Operatives Ltd, #9 Summons GROWMARK, Incorporated, #10 Summons Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, #11 Summons Simplot AB Retail, #12 Summons Syngenta Corporation, #13 Summons Tenkoz Inc, #14 Summons Univar Solution, #15 Summons Winfield Solutions, LLC)(Barrett, John (Don))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vienna Eqho Farms v. Bayer Cropscience Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Troy A. Bozarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Represented By: Eric J. Mahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc.
Represented By: Erick E. VanDorn
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply agent of FS
Represented By: Barry S. Noeltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vienna Eqho Farms
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: Victoria R. Sims
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Barbara Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?