Glenn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Crystal L Glenn
Defendant: Andrew M Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00272
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Barry Schultz (lmb)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A court may permit a plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis where the plaintiff has demonstrated indigence. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Nevertheless, a court can dismiss a qualified plaintiff's case if the action is clearly frivolous or malicious. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court finds that Plaintiff Crystal L. Glenn's affidavit demonstrates indigence. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Glenn's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Additionally, in Glenn's Complaint, she states that she seeks review of a decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration as permitted under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Accordingly, the Court finds nothing in the file to indicate that this action is frivolous or malicious. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 3/15/2021. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-272-SPM. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Crystal L Glenn. (Schultz, Barry)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Crystal L Glenn (Schultz, Barry)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Crystal L Glenn. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal L Glenn
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?