Rice et al v. Alton Memorial Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Na'Shau Cattleya Rice, James Rice, Ashante BriOn Willis, First Midwest Bank and Ashante Willis
Defendant: Alton Memorial Hospital, Dr. Olamide Kolade, Southern Illinois Health Care Foundation, Inc., United States of America and USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv00342
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell L. Makepeace on behalf of Alton Memorial Hospital (Makepeace, Russell)
May 28, 2021 Filing 31 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Bean, Kenneth)
May 28, 2021 Filing 30 AMENDED ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Alton Memorial Hospital. (Bean, Kenneth)
May 28, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W. Bean on behalf of Alton Memorial Hospital (Bean, Kenneth)
May 28, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by Alton Memorial Hospital Notice of Filing Amended Pleadings (Bean, Kenneth)
May 25, 2021 Filing 27 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Makepeace, Russell)
May 24, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE: Alton Memorial Hospital was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Alton Memorial Hospital shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/1/2021 (lmb)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Three documents have recently been filed referring to a minor child by her full name (See Docs. 21, 22, 24). Therefore, these documents have to be sealed, as they violate the Court's Local Rule 5.1(d)(2), which instructs parties that minor children should only be referenced by their initials. Moving forward, all parties in this matter are again DIRECTED to ensure their filings comport with Rule 5.1(d)(2) and only include the initials of the minor child (See Doc. 18). Additionally, Defendant Alton Memorial Hospital is DIRECTED to file an amended answer (Doc. 24) and amended notices of appearance (Docs. 21, 22) that comply with the Local Rules on or before May 24, 2021. This is the second Order the Court has entered about the parties complying with Rule 5.1(d)(2). Accordingly, the parties are cautioned that this is the last reminder the Court will give on this issue. The parties are WARNED that continuing to disregard the local rules and Orders of this Court may result in sanctions, as determined by the Court. See Fuery v. City of Chicago, 900 F.3d 450, 463 (7th Cir. 2018) (sanctions can be imposed under the court's inherent authority for willful disobedience of an order); 28 U.S.C. 1927; Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/20/2021. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Alton Memorial Hospital.(Makepeace, Russell)
April 30, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Alton Memorial Hospital to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Alton Memorial Hospital on 4/30/2021. Consent due by 5/21/2021 (lmb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W. Bean on behalf of Alton Memorial Hospital (Bean, Kenneth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell L. Makepeace on behalf of Alton Memorial Hospital (Makepeace, Russell)
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Timoney, Ryan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT N.R., a disabled minor by and through the Guardian of her Estate, FIRST MIDWEST BANK, and ASHANT WILLIS, Individually, and JAMES RICE, Individually against Alton Memorial Hospital, USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Rule 2-622 Attorney Affidavit, #2 Exhibit EX B - Affidavit and Cert of Merit of Gary Brickner, M.D. (amended))(Timoney, Ryan)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Every document on the docket currently includes information regarding a minor child by her full name (See Docs. 1-16). Therefore, the current docket has to be sealed, as this violates the Court's Local Rule 5.1(d)(2), which instructs parties that minor children should only be referenced by their initials. Moving forward, the parties are DIRECTED to ensure their filings comport with Rule 5.1(d)(2) and only include the initials of the minor child. Additionally, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an amended complaint and amended exhibits that comply with the Local Rules on or before April 30, 2021 (Doc. 1). Plaintiff is also DIRECTED to file an amended consent form (Doc. 15), as this document also includes the minor child's name and could, later on in the case, be automatically unsealed if the parties consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Both amended filings are due on or before April 30, 2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/23/2021. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #15 Notice (Other) filed by James Rice, Ashante Willis, First Midwest Bank. Incorrect event selected. Document entry sealed and docket text modified. In future filings, filer should select consent/non-consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge when filing this type of document. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Olamide Kolade served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Timoney, Ryan)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Entry to remain sealed. See Order at Doc. 18 for reference. (Timoney, Ryan) Modified docket text on 4/21/2021 (lmb). Modified on 4/29/2021 (mar).
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. USA served on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Beam, Jack)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Alton Memorial Hospital served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Beam, Jack)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Southern Illinois Health Care Foundation, Inc. served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Beam, Jack)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Affidavit filed by James Rice, Ashante Willis, First Midwest Bank, #9 Affidavit filed by James Rice, Ashante Willis, First Midwest Bank, #10 Affidavit filed by James Rice, Ashante Willis, First Midwest Bank. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Service of Process> Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY STRICKEN: AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet to Defendant USA by All Plaintiffs. (Beam, Jack) Modified on 4/12/2021 (lmb).
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY STRICKEN: AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet to Defendant Alton Memorial Hospital by All Plaintiffs. (Beam, Jack) Modified on 4/12/2021 (lmb).
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY STRICKEN: AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet to Defendant SIU by All Plaintiffs. (Beam, Jack) Modified on 4/12/2021 (lmb).
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to USA. Original mailed to Attorney Beam (lmb)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alton Memorial Hospital, Olamide Kolade, Southern Illinois Health Care Foundation, Inc. Original summons mailed to Attorney Beam. (lmb)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: First Midwest Bank, James Rice, Ashante Willis. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-342-MAB. Consent due by 4/21/2021 (lmb)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patterson, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P Timoney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Timoney, Ryan)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack M Beam on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Beam, Jack)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4441582.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Rule 2-622 Attorney Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit and Cert of Merit of Gary Brickner, M.D., #4 Summons Summons to USA, #5 Summons Summons to Alton Memorial Hospital, #6 Summons Summons to Olamide Kolade, M.D., #7 Summons Summons to Southern Illinois Health Care Foundation, Inc.)(Timoney, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice et al v. Alton Memorial Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Kenneth W. Bean
Represented By: Russell L. Makepeace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Olamide Kolade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Illinois Health Care Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Na'Shau Cattleya Rice
Represented By: Matthew M Patterson
Represented By: Ryan P Timoney
Represented By: Jack M Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rice
Represented By: Matthew M Patterson
Represented By: Ryan P Timoney
Represented By: Jack M Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashante BriOn Willis
Represented By: Matthew M Patterson
Represented By: Ryan P Timoney
Represented By: Jack M Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Midwest Bank
Represented By: Matthew M Patterson
Represented By: Ryan P Timoney
Represented By: Jack M Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashante Willis
Represented By: Matthew M Patterson
Represented By: Ryan P Timoney
Represented By: Jack M Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?