Tisdale v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Melissa Tisdale
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00466
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE - All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Nonetheless, to maintain an equalized docket and to foster efficiency, this action will not be referred to a magistrate judge at this time. See Administrative Order No. 293. Accordingly, until further notice, this case will remain with the assigned district judge. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #9 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The document attached is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pavisian, James) Modified as FINAL and unsealed on 7/8/2021 (kls3).
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan) Unsealed on 7/8/2021 (kls3).
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Pavisian. (kek)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Pavisian, James)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/22/2021. (mah)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-466-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (ack)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Pavisian on behalf of Melissa Tisdale (Pavisian, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Tisdale. (Pavisian, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Melissa Tisdale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pavisian, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tisdale v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Tisdale
Represented By: James Pavisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?