Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co. v. Burlington Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.
Defendant: Gaylon Cruse, Mark Duckworth, Southern Truss, Inc., Cruse Construction Company, Douglas Forrest, The Burlington Insurance Company and Burlington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00497
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Emison, J.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Serra on behalf of Gaylon Cruse, Cruse Construction Company, Mark Duckworth (Serra, Michael)
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Gaylon Cruse, Cruse Construction Company, and Mark Duckworth to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Gaylon Cruse, Cruse Construction Company, and Mark Duckworth on 6/24/2021. Consent due by 7/15/2021 (lmb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gaylon Cruse, Cruse Construction Company, Mark Duckworth.(Emison, J.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Kent Emison on behalf of Gaylon Cruse, Cruse Construction Company, Mark Duckworth (Emison, J.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. Gaylon Cruse served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Buck, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. Mark Duckworth served on 6/5/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Buck, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. Douglas Forrest served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Buck, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. Southern Truss, Inc. served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Buck, Thomas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. Burlington Insurance Company served on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Buck, Thomas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Buck, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Burlington Insurance Company. Original mailed to requesting party. (clt)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gaylon Cruse, Mark Duckworth, Douglas Forrest, Southern Truss, Inc. Originals mailed to requesting party. (clt)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Gaylon Cruse individually and d/b/a Cruse Construction Company, #2 Summons to Mark Duckworth, #3 Summons to Douglas Forrest, #4 Summons to Southern Truss, Inc.)(Buck, Thomas)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Buck on behalf of Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co. (Buck, Thomas)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-497-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/9/2021 (ack)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4482545.), filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buck, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co. v. Burlington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Cruse
Represented By: J. Kent Emison
Represented By: Michael J Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Duckworth
Represented By: J. Kent Emison
Represented By: Michael J Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Truss, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruse Construction Company
Represented By: J. Kent Emison
Represented By: Michael J Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Burlington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Co.
Represented By: Thomas L. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?