Bailey et al v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Plaintiff: Trustee of the Effie Bailey Land Trust and Keith Lyle Bailey
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Bayer CropScience LP, Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Winfield Solutions, LLC and Corteva Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00512
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE : Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case 4:21-cv-00812, filed 07/06/2021. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 1, 2021 Filing 31 Docket Annotation - Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Missouri. (kek)
July 1, 2021 Filing 30 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri and MDL 2993 In Re: Crop Inputs Antitrust Litigation.(kek)
July 1, 2021 Filing 29 PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2). (kek)
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Bayer CropScience LP waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 21, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Tenkoz Inc. waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 21, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Syngenta Corporation waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 15, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Corteva Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 15, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CHS Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 14, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to CHS Inc., Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc. Originals mailed to requesting party. (clt)
June 11, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Requested. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #10 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Keith Lyle Bailey. Filer used incorrect service date. Docket text and answer due date modified. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. BASF Corporation waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren) Modified service date as per document on 6/8/2021 (lmb).
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Winfield Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barnes, Lauren)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cargill Incorporated waiver sent on 6/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Ognibene, Abbye)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren Guth Barnes ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas M Sobol ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4490529 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ognibene, Abbye)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas M Sobol $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4490471 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren Guth Barnes $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4490421 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barnes, Lauren)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-512-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (trb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Kurowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kurowski, Daniel)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4489482.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurowski, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Bayer CropScience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee of the Effie Bailey Land Trust
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Lyle Bailey
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Represented By: Abbye Rose Klamann Ognibene
Represented By: Lauren Guth Barnes
Represented By: Thomas M Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?