Meyer et al v. Raoul et al
Plaintiff: DAVID MEYER, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, EVA DAVIS, ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION and MITCHELL NALLEY
Defendant: KWAME RAOUL, BRENDAN KELLY, DWIGHT A. BAIRD, ERIC WEIS, RICHARD WATSON, JAMES GOMRIC, JOSHUA MORRISON and CHRISTOPHER PALMER
Case Number: 3:2021cv00518
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Pleading by Brendan Kelly. (Bautista, Laura)
July 29, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dwight A. Baird, Joshua Morrison, Christopher Palmer, Eric Weis. Responses due by 9/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit National Rifle Association of America Inc v Swearingen, 2021 WL 2592545, #2 Exhibit Hirschfeld v Bureau of Alcohol Firearms Tobacco And Explosives, 2021 WL 2934468, #3 Exhibit Goodman v Carter, 2001 WL 755137, #4 Exhibit Corbier v Watson, 2018 WL 4815391, #5 Exhibit Stewart v Lakin, 2018 WL 1181312, #6 Exhibit Rogers v Hacker, 2021 WL 2711745)(Jacobi, Benjamin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brendan Kelly served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Ambler, Christian)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, Defendant Kwame Raoul's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 12, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/14/21. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 14, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Bautista on behalf of Brendan Kelly (Bautista, Laura)
July 14, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron P. Wenzloff on behalf of Brendan Kelly, Kwame Raoul (Wenzloff, Aaron)
July 14, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac N. Freilich Jones on behalf of Brendan Kelly, Kwame Raoul (Freilich Jones, Isaac)
July 13, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kwame Raoul. (Bautista, Laura)
July 13, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Bautista on behalf of Kwame Raoul (Bautista, Laura)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Richard Watson and James Gomric seek an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Defendants Morrison, Weis, Palmer, and Baird requested and received a comparable extension on July 2, 2021. Defendants Watson and Gomric explain that they, too, require additional time to research Plaintiffs' claims and that they would like time to explore whether there are opportunities for the parties to submit joint briefs in an attempt to streamline the issues before the Court. For good cause shown, Defendants' motion for extension of time to file answer is GRANTED. Defendants Watson and Gomric shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by August 5, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/13/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 6, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Ysursa on behalf of Richard Watson (Ysursa, Thomas)
July 6, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Ysursa on behalf of James Gomric (Ysursa, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or otherwise plead in response by James Gomric, Richard Watson. (Hunter, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 35 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Gomric, Richard Watson. (Hunter, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Hunter on behalf of James Gomric, Richard Watson (Hunter, Thomas)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs have sued state and county officials in Illinois seeking declarations that Illinois' prohibition on carrying of a handgun by persons between the ages of 18 and 20 years old is unconstitutional. Defendants Morrison, Weis, Palmer, and Baird, officials from Kendall County and Fayette County, request an additional 28 days to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. They explain that some similarly situated Defendants from other counties have yet to be served and that an extension of time may permit the parties to submit joint responsive pleadings. Counsel for the Kendall County and Fayette County Defendants also requires additional time to investigate Plaintiffs' claims and to research potential defenses. For good cause shown, Defendants' motion for extension of time is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants Morrison, Weis, Palmer, and Baird to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended through July 29, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/2/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 1, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to File Responsive Pleading by Dwight A. Baird, Joshua Morrison, Christopher Palmer, Eric Weis. (Jacobi, Benjamin)
June 29, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. McNaught on behalf of Dwight A. Baird, Joshua Morrison, Christopher Palmer, Eric Weis (McNaught, Karen)
June 29, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacobi on behalf of Dwight A. Baird, Joshua Morrison, Christopher Palmer, Eric Weis (Jacobi, Benjamin)
June 23, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Dwight A. Baird served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Ambler, Christian)
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Eric Weis served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Ambler, Christian)
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Joshua Morrison served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Ambler, Christian)
June 23, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Christopher Palmer served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Ambler, Christian)
June 22, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed Richard Watson served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (clt)
June 21, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Reissued as to Brendan Kelly and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Sigale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sigale, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Requested. (Ambler, Christian)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bergstrom on behalf of all Plaintiffs.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patterson on behalf of all Plaintiffs.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thompson on behalf of all Plaintiffs.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William V. Bergstrom $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4493196 by on behalf of Eva Davis, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Illinois State Rifle Association, David Meyer, Mitchell Nalley, Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admissions of William V. Bergstrom)(Bergstrom, William)
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter A. Patterson $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4493193 by on behalf of Eva Davis, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Illinois State Rifle Association, David Meyer, Mitchell Nalley, Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admissions of Peter A. Patterson)(Patterson, Peter)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David H. Thompson $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4493189 by on behalf of Eva Davis, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Illinois State Rifle Association, David Meyer, Mitchell Nalley, Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bar Admissions of David H. Thompson)(Thompson, David)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Dwight A. Baird and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Richard Watson and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Christopher Palmer and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Eric Weis and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to James Gomric and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Joshua Morrison and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Brendan Kelly and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kwame Raoul and original mailed to Attorney Ambler. (kdw)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/1/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Ambler, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Ambler, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian D. Ambler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ambler, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by David Meyer, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, Mitchell Nalley, Eva Davis, Illinois State Rifle Association. Notice of Appearances and Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed as separate documents on the docket using the correct event. Notice of Appearance can be found under Civil->Other Filings->Notice of Appearance. The Corporate Disclosure event can be found under Civil->Other Filings->Other Documents. Filer will need to re-file the documents as two separate entries. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-518-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdw)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #3 Exhibit corporate disclosure statement)(Ambler, Christian)
May 27, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0754-4489957 (ack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. Raoul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MEYER
Represented By: Christian D. Ambler
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Represented By: Christian D. Ambler
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: Christian D. Ambler
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA DAVIS
Represented By: Christian D. Ambler
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Christian D. Ambler
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCHELL NALLEY
Represented By: Christian D. Ambler
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KWAME RAOUL
Represented By: Aaron P. Wenzloff
Represented By: Isaac N. Freilich Jones
Represented By: Laura K. Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDAN KELLY
Represented By: Aaron P. Wenzloff
Represented By: Isaac N. Freilich Jones
Represented By: Laura K. Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWIGHT A. BAIRD
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC WEIS
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD WATSON
Represented By: Thomas J Hunter
Represented By: Thomas R. Ysursa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GOMRIC
Represented By: Thomas J Hunter
Represented By: Thomas R. Ysursa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA MORRISON
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER PALMER
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobi
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?