Lockwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lea Ann Lockwood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00536
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Sutterfield for service. (kls3)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall review the Order carefully for information about service of process by the United States Marshals Service. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 7/2/2021. (kll)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-536-DWD. (kls3)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Sutterfield on behalf of Lea Ann Lockwood (Sutterfield, David)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lea Ann Lockwood. (Sutterfield, David)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lea Ann Lockwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interest, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285 forms)(Sutterfield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Ann Lockwood
Represented By: David W. Sutterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?