Abanukam v. Acuff et al
Petitioner: Justin Abanukam
Respondent: Robert Guadian, Alejandro Mayorkas, Damon Acuff, Merrick Garrand and Mattew Albence
Case Number: 3:2021cv00545
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 7/14/2021. (tjk)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/14/2021. (beb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Granting #8 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition (Doc. 1) filed by Merrick Garrand, Alejandro Mayorkas, Robert Guadian, Mattew Albence, Damon Acuff. The Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED. However, the dismissal is without prejudice to Abanukam pursuing his habeas corpus claims in his pending action in the Northern District of Texas, Abanukam v. Barr, et al., Case No. 20-cv-252-C, and without prejudice to any suit he may bring regarding his conditions of confinement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the Northern District of Texas, Abilene Division, for filing or reference in Abanukam v. Barr, et al., Case No. 20-cv-252-C (N.D. Tex.). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/14/2021. (beb)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition (Doc. 1) filed by Justin Abanukam. (kare)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to Attorney Genereal on 6/22/2021. (tjk)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On June 23, 2021, Respondents filed a Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8 ). Petitioner is granted time in which to file a response to any factual or legal matters raised by Respondents' motion. Petitioner is cautioned that failure to file a response may be deemed to be an admission of the merits of the motion, pursuant to SDIL-LR 7.1(c). This means that the motion to dismiss will most likely be granted and this case will be dismissed. Petitioner shall file his response on or before July 26, 2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/24/2021. (beb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 6/15/2021. (tjk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition (Doc. 1) by Damon Acuff, Mattew Albence, Merrick Garrand, Robert Guadian, Alejandro Mayorkas. Responses due by 7/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (N.D. Tex. Petition))(Biersbach, Nicholas)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to USAO on 6/14/2021. (tjk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed on Habeas Corpus Acknowledgement Letter by Robert Guadian, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garrand, Damon Acuff, Mattew Albence. (Biersbach, Nicholas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Biersbach on behalf of Damon Acuff, Mattew Albence, Merrick Garrand, Robert Guadian, Alejandro Mayorkas (Biersbach, Nicholas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Letter to Damon Acuff constituting service. (tjk)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Service of Process upon all Respondents. Respondents are ORDERED to answer the Petition or otherwise plead within twenty (20) days of the date this order is entered (on or before June 30, 2021). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/10/2021. (beb)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and filing fee. Your case number is 21-545-JPG. The following is important information concerning the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court will review your petition to determine whether it survives preliminary review under Rule 4 and Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in an Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you do not receive a preliminary review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the Court has completed the preliminary review of your petition. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). In the event your petition survives the preliminary review, the Court will instruct the respondent to file a response to the petition and you will be notified of your deadline to file a reply. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case.. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/8/2021. (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Justin Abanukam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(kare) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/11/2021) (mar).
June 8, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 44625014041 (kare)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abanukam v. Acuff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Abanukam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Guadian
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Damon Acuff
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garrand
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mattew Albence
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?