Maya v. Acuff et al
Petitioner: Wasia K. Maya
Respondent: Henry Lucero, Alejandro Mayorkas, Damon Acuff, Merrick Garrand and Tae Johnson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00755
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Mootness) ; MOTION to Move to a Difference Detention Center filed by Wasia K. Maya. (jaj)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Document 13 sent to Wasia K. Maya. (jaj)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Documents 1,3,4 sent to Unknown (kare)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On August 12, 2021, Respondents filed a Motion to Dismiss Petition as Moot (Doc. #16 ). Petitioner is granted time in which to file a response to any factual or legal matters raised by Respondents' motion. Petitioner is cautioned that failure to file a response may be deemed to be an admission of the merits of the motion, pursuant to SDIL-LR 7.1(c). This means that the motion to dismiss will most likely be granted and this case will be dismissed. Petitioner shall file his response on or before September 13, 2021. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner at the address provided on the motion: Wasia Maya, St. Genevieve County Sheriff's Office Detention Center, 5 Basler Drive, St. Genevieve, MO 63670, as well as to his address of record. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/17/2021. (beb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Mootness) by Damon Acuff, Merrick Garrand, Tae Johnson, Henry Lucero, Alejandro Mayorkas. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DO Hentz Decl.), #2 Att. 1 to Ex. A (Form I-203A), #3 Att. 2 to Ex. A (Rule 5(c)(3) Documents))(Biersbach, Nicholas)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED Reply to #6 Response filed by Wasia K. Maya. (jaj)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Add New Exhibit by Wasia K. Maya. (jaj)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to Mayorkas. (tjk)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Damon Acuff, Merrick Garrand, Tae Johnson, Henry Lucero, Alejandro Mayorkas regarding Petitioner's Indictment in Western District of Missouri (Biersbach, Nicholas)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. (tjk)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Reply to #6 Response to Petition filed by Wasia K. Maya. (jaj)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. (tjk)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 7/19/2021. (tjk)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On July 20, 2021, Respondents filed their Response to the Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #6 ). Petitioner shall file any reply that he has to the factual or legal matters raised by Respondents on or before August 10, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/21/2021. (beb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Petitioner's reply due by 8/10/2021. (clt)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Damon Acuff, Merrick Garrand, Tae Johnson, Henry Lucero, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (DO Hentz Decl.))(Biersbach, Nicholas)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Biersbach on behalf of Damon Acuff, Merrick Garrand, Tae Johnson, Henry Lucero, Alejandro Mayorkas (Biersbach, Nicholas)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter to Damon Acuff constituting service. (tjk)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Service of Process upon Respondents. Respondents are ORDERED to answer the Petition or otherwise plead on or before July 21, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/1/2021. (beb)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and filing fee. Your case number is 21-755-NJR. The following is important information concerning the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court will review your petition to determine whether it survives preliminary review under Rule 4 and Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in United States District Courts. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in an Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you do not receive a preliminary review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the Court has completed the preliminary review of your petition. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). In the event your petition survives the preliminary review, the Court will instruct the respondent to file a response to the petition and you will be notified of your deadline to file a reply. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/30/2021. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Wasia K. Maya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits and envelope)(jaj)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee paid in full: $ 5.00, receipt number 44625014092 (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maya v. Acuff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wasia K. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Lucero
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Damon Acuff
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garrand
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tae Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas J. Biersbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?