Cantrell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Harvey Cantrell
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00758
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. #36 ). Answer due September 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/27/2021. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 26, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Scoggins, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Harvey Cantrell. (clt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 34 EXHIBIT by Harvey Cantrell. (clt)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. #30 ). Answer due by August 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/6/2021. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 28, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Transfer Case by Harvey Cantrell. (clt)
July 20, 2021 Filing 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Docs 22 and 23 sent to Harvey Cantrell (clt)
July 13, 2021 Filing 30 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (with certificate of service) by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Scoggins, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 29 EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Scoggins, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Substitute Attorney (Doc. #27 ). Attorney Elizabeth P. Stepan; Richard Blake and Arthurice Tylune Brundidge terminated. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/9/2021. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 9, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Andrew Saul. (Scoggins, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jason Scoggins on behalf of Andrew Saul (Scoggins, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Harvey Cantrell. (clt)
July 2, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harvey Cantrell (amv)
June 30, 2021 Filing 23 Letter to counsel regarding transfer (amv)
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-758-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (amv)
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00497. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING #19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Andrew Saul. The motion is granted and this action is transferred to the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 6/29/21. (copy mailed to plaintiff and case transferred electronically to Southern Illinois) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Andrew Saul that the motion be granted and that this action be transferred to the Southern District of Illinois. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/7/21. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Andrew Saul. (Blake, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
March 23, 2021 REFERRAL OF #18 Response to Motion to Judge Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Harvey Cantrell. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order re: #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Andrew Saul. If Plaintiff contests that is state of residence is Illinois, Plaintiff is ordered to file proof of his state of residence on or before 2/26/21. ( Responses due by 2/26/2021). All pending deadlines are stayed pending ruling on Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 2/12/21. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 brief in support of motion) (Blake, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Blake on behalf of Andrew Saul (Blake, Richard) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
February 12, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Transfer Venue Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Answer and transcript due from Andrew Saul on 2/18/2021 per doc. 13. (copy of NEF mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Motion for Extension of time to file his response. Defendant's response is due on or before February 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/20/21. (lto) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
January 20, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by All Defendants. (Brundidge, Arthurice) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Supplement by Harvey Cantrell re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 documents) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of SS Complaint served 11/9/20 as to SSI (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of certified mail re: SS Complaint served 10/22/20 as to USAG (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA on 10/20/2020, answer due 1/18/21. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Stepan on behalf of Andrew Saul (Stepan, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Supplement by Harvey Cantrell re #1 SS Complaint (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/14/20. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General via ecertify. (cmj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 certified mail) (cmj). [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/14/20. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey Cantrell. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 SS COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Harvey Cantrell. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/6/2021; ref to Judge Murray (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 6/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Represented By: Richard Blake
Represented By: Arthurice Tylune Brundidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael Jason Scoggins
Represented By: Arthurice Tylune Brundidge
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Represented By: Richard Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?