Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ann Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00775
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding service of process. Pursuant to Doc. #4 granting In Forma Pauperis status, Clerk is DIRECTED to send plaintiff blank summons and USM-285 forms, which U.S. Marshalls are DIRECTED to serve upon receipt. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 8/30/2021. (jce)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 7/7/2021. (jce)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie Smith. (lmb)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Stephanie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmb)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-775-SPM. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?