Centreville Citizens for Change et al v. City of Cahokia Heights et al
Plaintiff: Centreville Citizens for Change, Walter Byrd, Lester Goree, William McNeal, Delores Saffold-Crigler, Barbara Eiland, Sharon Smith, Bobby Smith, Yvette Lyles, Patricia Greenwood, Leon Spruell, Mario Gladney, Tamara Gladney, Hattie Ivy, Sheila Gladney, Joan Dancy, Michael Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Vanessa Marion, Carolyn Taggart, Maurice Taggart, Leichue Hych, Lakesha Ware, Mary Anthony, Leola Green, Jeanette Green, Vittorio Blaylock, Allene Hopkins, James Cox, Reuben Ann Cox and Onnie Randolph
Defendant: City of Cahokia Heights, Commonfields of Cahokia and Commonfields of Cahokia Public Water District
Case Number: 3:2021cv00842
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 20 Sealed Reference List by #12 filed by Lakesha Ware, Leichue Hych, William McNeal, Patricia Johnson, Leola Green, Walter Byrd, Yvette Lyles, Bobby Smith, Michael Johnson, Lester Goree, Sharon Smith, Barbara Eiland, Allene Hopkins, Maurice Taggart, Vanessa Marion, Mario Gladney, Leon Spruell, Carolyn Taggart, Jeanette Green, Sheila Gladney, Joan Dancy, Centreville Citizens for Change, Patricia Greenwood, Mary Anthony, Delores Saffold-Crigler, Tamara Gladney, Vittorio Blaylock, Hattie Ivy. (Rock, Mary)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #17 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint. Defendant City of Cahokia Heights requests an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. For good cause shown, the motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by October 20, 2021. Plaintiffs seek leave to file an exhibit related to redacted information in their complaint under seal because the redacted information includes personal identifying information. For good cause shown, the motion for leave to file under seal is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their document under seal instanter. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/27/2021. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #17 Motion for Leave to File filed by Lakesha Ware, Leichue Hych, William McNeal, Onnie Randolph, Patricia Johnson, Leola Green, Walter Byrd, Reuben Ann Cox, Yvette Lyles, Bobby Smith, Michael Johnson, Lester Goree, Sharon Smith, Barbara Eiland, Allene Hopkins, Maurice Taggart, Vanessa Marion, Mario Gladney, Leon Spruell, Carolyn Taggart, Jeanette Green, Sheila Gladney, Joan Dancy, Centreville Citizens for Change, Patricia Greenwood, Mary Anthony, Delores Saffold-Crigler, Tamara Gladney, James Cox, Vittorio Blaylock, Hattie Ivy. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Rock, Mary)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. City of Cahokia Heights served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021; Commonfields of Cahokia Public Water District served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Rock, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary K. Rock on behalf of Centreville Citizens for Change (Rock, Mary)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint by City of Cahokia Heights. (Funk, Brian)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Funk on behalf of City of Cahokia Heights (Funk, Brian)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Musiker, Deborah)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to City of Cahokia Heights. Original mailed to Attorney Musiker. (lmb)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested. (Musiker, Deborah)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kalila Jelani Jackson (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kalila Jelani Jackson $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4531543 by on behalf of Mary Anthony, Vittorio Blaylock, Walter Byrd, Joan Dancy, Barbara Eiland, Mario Gladney, Sheila Gladney, Tamara Gladney, Lester Goree, Jeanette Green, Leola Green, Patricia Greenwood, Allene Hopkins, Leichue Hych, Hattie Ivy, Michael Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Yvette Lyles, Vanessa Marion, William McNeal, Delores Saffold-Crigler, Bobby Smith, Sharon Smith, Leon Spruell, Carolyn Taggart, Maurice Taggart, Lakesha Ware. (Jackson, Kalila)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commonfields of Cahokia Public Water District. Original mailed to requesting party. (clt)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna M. Sewell on behalf of Centreville Citizens for Change. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-00842-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna M. Sewell $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4530784 by on behalf of Centreville Citizens for Change. (Sewell, Anna)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denise Nelson on behalf of Mary Anthony, Vittorio Blaylock, Walter Byrd, Joan Dancy, Barbara Eiland, Mario Gladney, Sheila Gladney, Tamara Gladney, Lester Goree, Jeanette Green, Leola Green, Patricia Greenwood, Allene Hopkins, Leichue Hych, Hattie Ivy, Michael Johnson, Patricia Johnson, Yvette Lyles, Vanessa Marion, William McNeal, Delores Saffold-Crigler, Bobby Smith, Sharon Smith, Leon Spruell, Carolyn Taggart, Maurice Taggart, Lakesha Ware (Nelson, Nicole)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Musiker on behalf of Centreville Citizens for Change (Musiker, Deborah)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4530481.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Musiker, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centreville Citizens for Change et al v. City of Cahokia Heights et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centreville Citizens for Change
Represented By: Anna M. Sewell
Represented By: Deborah Musiker
Represented By: Mary K. Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Byrd
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Goree
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McNeal
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Saffold-Crigler
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Eiland
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Smith
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Lyles
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Greenwood
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Spruell
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Gladney
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Gladney
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Ivy
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Gladney
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Dancy
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Johnson
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Marion
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Taggart
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Taggart
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leichue Hych
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakesha Ware
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anthony
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leola Green
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Green
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vittorio Blaylock
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allene Hopkins
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cox
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Ann Cox
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onnie Randolph
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cahokia Heights
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonfields of Cahokia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonfields of Cahokia Public Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?