Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation v. Pete Patel
Plaintiff: Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market and Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation doing business as Pete's Fresh Market
Defendant: Pete Patel D/B/A Pete's Market and Pete Patel doing business as Pete's Market
Case Number: 3:2021cv00863
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation. Answer due 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/13/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation. Pete Patel served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Bolos, Michelle)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation. (Bolos, Michelle)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Pete Patel d/b/a Pete's Market, and returned to Attorney Hartzell for service. (kls3)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested. (Hartzell, Julianne)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING FILINGS: Docs. 1-4 were incorrectly filed. The login used and the signature do not match. Counsel is reminded to correctly file all future documents or the documents will be stricken, as is our usual course of action; the login used and the signature on the document must match. Also, Docs. 2, 5 and 6 are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only for future filings. (kls3)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 Report of Filing. (kls3)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-863-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Bolos on behalf of Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market (Bolos, Michelle)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julianne M. Hartzell on behalf of Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market (Hartzell, Julianne)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market Plaintiff's Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks (Hartzell, Julianne)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market. (Hartzell, Julianne)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Hartzell, Julianne)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pete Patel D/B/A Pete's Market ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4537522.), filed by Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs. A-D)(Hartzell, Julianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation v. Pete Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation D/B/A Pete's Fresh Market
Represented By: Michelle Bolos
Represented By: Julianne M. Hartzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete's Fresh Market 4700 Corporation doing business as Pete's Fresh Market
Represented By: Michelle Bolos
Represented By: Julianne M. Hartzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Patel D/B/A Pete's Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Patel doing business as Pete's Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?