Kohlmiller et al v. Consumer Law Protection, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Ronald D Kohlmiller and Theresa M Kohlmiller
Defendant: Consumer Law Protection LLC, Resort Transfer Group LLC, Square One Development Group Inc., Premier Reservation Group LLC, Dan Chudy, Makenzie D Westcott, Matt Titus, Amy DeFatte, George Reed, LouAnn Reed, Crestline Hotels & Resorts LLC, Excel Holdings 3 LLC, Consumer Law Protection, LLC, Resort Transfer Group, LLC doing business as Consumer Law Protection Lawyers, Square One Development Group, Inc., Premier Reservation Group, LLC, Makenzie David Westcott, Amy D. DeFatte, George L. Reed and Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00865
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 15 Acknowledgment from St. Clair County Circuit Clerk re #13 Order of Remand (lmb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 Letter to St. Clair County Circuit Court regarding Order Remanding Case. (clt)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REMAND: Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED. This case is remanded to the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/31/2021. (mah)
August 29, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Premier Reservation Group, LLC, George L. Reed, LouAnn Reed, Resort Transfer Group, LLC, Square One Development Group, Inc., Matt Titus, Makenzie David Westcott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1. June 24 email, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 June 28 email, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3. June 29 email, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4. June 29 email, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5. June 29 email)(George, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Supplement to Notice of Removal Defendants' Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC and Excel Holdings 3 LLC Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Duree, David)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Excel Holdings 3 LLC. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Valenzi, Shane)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shane D. Valenzi on behalf of Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Excel Holdings 3 LLC. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shane D. Valenzi $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4539902 by on behalf of Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Excel Holdings 3 LLC. (Valenzi, Shane)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Ronald D Kohlmiller, Theresa M Kohlmiller. (Duree, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Duree, #2 Exhibit A-E)(Duree, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Duree on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duree, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. George on behalf of All Defendants (George, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION : See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney George does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-865-SMY. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St Clair County Circuit Court State of Illinois, case number 21-L-0461 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4537672), filed by Matt Titus, Makenzie D Westcott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Damages in Excess of $100,000, #4 Exhibit Notice of Service on Matt Titus and Makenzie Westcott, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal to St Clair County Court, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs)(George, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohlmiller et al v. Consumer Law Protection, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald D Kohlmiller
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M Kohlmiller
Represented By: David M. Duree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Law Protection LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resort Transfer Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square One Development Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Reservation Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Chudy
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makenzie D Westcott
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Titus
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy DeFatte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LouAnn Reed
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestline Hotels & Resorts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Holdings 3 LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Valenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Law Protection, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resort Transfer Group, LLC doing business as Consumer Law Protection Lawyers
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square One Development Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Reservation Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makenzie David Westcott
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy D. DeFatte
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L. Reed
Represented By: Michael T. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Valenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?