Lueken v. Crossroads Cancer Center et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Lueken
Defendant: Crossroads Cancer Center, Michael Bruin and Irene Dy
Case Number: 3:2021cv00883
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #3 Complaint by Jennifer Lynn Lueken.. (kek)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/17/2021. (jdh)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff Jennifer Lynn Lueken's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, DISMISSING her Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to ENTER JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/17/2021. (cab).
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #3 Complaint, by Jennifer Lynn Lueken. (kek)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kdw)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff Jennifer Lueken. (kls3)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Lynn Lueken. (kek)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Michael Bruin, Crossroads Cancer Center, Irene Dy, filed by Jennifer Lynn Lueken.(kek)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Jennifer Lynn Lueken to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Jennifer Lynn Lueken on 8/4/2021. Consent due by 8/25/2021 (kek)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-883-JPG Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (kek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lueken v. Crossroads Cancer Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Lueken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Cancer Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Dy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?