USA v. Everett et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Joshua W. Everett, Marie R. Elliott and Illinois Housing Development Authority
Case Number: 3:2021cv00887
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Illinois Housing Development Authority served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Hanna, Adam)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marie R. Elliott. Original summons and service packet sent to USMS. (lmb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Illinois Housing Development Authority. Original summons and service packet sent to USMS. (lmb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Joshua W. Everett waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Hanna, Adam)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-887-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kek)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marie R. Elliott, Joshua W. Everett, Illinois Housing Development Authority, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Everett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua W. Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie R. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Housing Development Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?