Lockhart et al v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Steven P Lockhart, Alicia Lockhart and Donna Lockhart
Defendant: Russell Adams, Andrew Rotman, Trenton Masterson, James White, Diane Brady, Brenda Buchanan, Billie Forsythe, Karen Kensler, City of Lawrenceville IL and Lawrence County, IL
Case Number: 3:2021cv01033
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Billie Forsythe. (Bleyer, Joseph)
October 17, 2021 Filing 23 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Billie Forsythe. (Bleyer, Joseph)
October 17, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Bleyer on behalf of Billie Forsythe (Bleyer, Joseph)
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 Summonses Issued as to Diane Brady, Billie Forsythe, and Karen Kensler. Originals mailed to Attorney Redwood. (kek)
October 8, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Redwood, Jude)
September 29, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by James White.(Pierce, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER terminating as moot #17 Motion for Extension of Time; pursuant to Doc. #14 Waiver of Service, Defendant James White's Answer is due to be filed on or before November 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 9/24/2021. (jce)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint, by James White. (Pierce, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James White. (Pierce, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Pierce on behalf of James White (Pierce, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James White. James White waiver sent on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Pierce, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 Complaint; Brenda Buchanan is granted an extension up to and including October 25, 2021, which is an extension of 30 days and is the same date the Answer is due for several other defendants. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 9/24/2021. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brenda Buchanan. (Bleyer, Joseph)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brenda Buchanan. (Bleyer, Joseph)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Bleyer on behalf of Brenda Buchanan (Bleyer, Joseph)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence J. Corrigan on behalf of Russell Adams, Lawrence County, IL, Trenton Masterson, Andrew Rotman (Corrigan, Terence)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. McNaught on behalf of Russell Adams, Lawrence County, IL, Trenton Masterson, Andrew Rotman (McNaught, Karen)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Russell Adams waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021; Lawrence County, IL waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021; Trenton Masterson waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021; Andrew Rotman waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Redwood, Jude)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Adams, Brady, Buchanan, Forsythe, Kensler, Lawrence County,IL, Masterson, Rotman, White on 8/23/21 and 8/25/21 by All Plaintiffs. Waiver of Service due by 9/24/2021. (Redwood, Jude)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jude M. Redwood on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Redwood, Jude)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Russell Adams, Diane Brady, Brenda Buchanan, Billie Forsythe, Karen Kensler, Lawrence County, IL, Trenton Masterson, Andrew Rotman, James White ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4555991.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Redwood, Jude)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Document to be refiled using the correct link of "Civil/Initial Pleadings and Service/Complaint". Also, no appearance on file for Attorney Redwood. No indication of the filing fee status. Filer to correct deficiencies and refile. (kls3)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1033-SPM. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 STRICKEN. EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Complaint and Civil cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Redwood, Judith) Modified on 8/20/2021 (kls3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockhart et al v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven P Lockhart
Represented By: Jude M. Redwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Lockhart
Represented By: Jude M. Redwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lockhart
Represented By: Jude M. Redwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Adams
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Represented By: Terence J. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Rotman
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Represented By: Terence J. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Masterson
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Represented By: Terence J. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James White
Represented By: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Buchanan
Represented By: Joseph A. Bleyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Forsythe
Represented By: Joseph A. Bleyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Kensler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lawrenceville IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County, IL
Represented By: Karen L. McNaught
Represented By: Terence J. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?