Larry Trover Produce, Inc. v. Certis U.S.A. L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Trover Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Certis U.S.A. L.L.C., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Nutrien Ltd. and Omnilytics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01035
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Cantrell, Jonathan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omnilytics, Inc.. (Christensen, Cameron)
September 29, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Omnilytics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Decl of Tyler Homer)(Christensen, Cameron)
September 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Omnilytics, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2021 (Christensen, Cameron)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery due by 5/9/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2022. Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 9/13/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 9/26/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
September 23, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Nutrien Ltd..(Petersen, Matthew)
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ryan Cantrell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cantrell, Jonathan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard K. Kruger on behalf of Larry Trover Produce, Inc. (Kruger, Richard)
September 1, 2021 Filing 15 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 9/13/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 9/26/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Certis U.S.A. L.L.C.. (Stetson, Roger)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Certis U.S.A. L.L.C.. Responses due by 9/30/2021 (Stetson, Roger)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (UNOPPOSED Motion) filed by Nutrien Ltd., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. Answer due 9/23/2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/26/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Lancaster on behalf of Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Nutrien Ltd. (Lancaster, Jennifer)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Nutrien Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate AGU US Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Agrium Inc., Other Affiliate Agrium US, Inc., Other Affiliate United Agri Products, Inc. for Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Nutrien Ltd.. (Petersen, Matthew)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (UNOPPOSED Motion) by Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Nutrien Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Petersen, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cameron S. Christensen on behalf of Omnilytics, Inc. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cameron S. Christensen $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4559844 by on behalf of Omnilytics, Inc.. (Christensen, Cameron)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Certis U.S.A. L.L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Defendant Certis U.S.A. L.L.C.'s Notice of Removal)(Stetson, Roger)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-01035-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brian Lurie on behalf of Certis U.S.A. L.L.C. (Lurie, David)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Hudson Stetson on behalf of Certis U.S.A. L.L.C. (Stetson, Roger)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certis U.S.A. L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui & Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc. for Certis U.S.A. L.L.C.. (Stetson, Roger)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial Circuit, Johnson County, case number 21-L-7 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4555650), filed by Certis U.S.A. L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint to Certis, #3 Exhibit C - Filed Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Nutrien Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Omnilytics Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Civil Cover Sheet)(Stetson, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry Trover Produce, Inc. v. Certis U.S.A. L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Trover Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Richard K. Kruger
Represented By: Jonathan Ryan Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certis U.S.A. L.L.C.
Represented By: David Brian Lurie
Represented By: Roger Hudson Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Petersen
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew M. Petersen
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnilytics, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?