USA v. $24,000.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $24,000.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Mohammed Farhat
Case Number: 3:2021cv01073
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mohammed Farhat. (Pearson, Tyler)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 CLAIM Verified by Mohammed Farhat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pearson, Tyler)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Eric Pearson on behalf of Mohammed Farhat (Pearson, Tyler)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke L Stevens on behalf of Mohammed Farhat (Stevens, Brooke)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohammed Farhat. Attorney Seiden is not generally admitted in this Court. Attorney Seiden must first be admitted generally or pro hac before entering his appearance in this matter. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohammed Farhat, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohammed Farhat, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Mohammed Farhat. The Notices filed are fillable documents. Fillable documents must be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 STRICKEN. NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Seiden on behalf of Mohammed Farhat (Seiden, Glenn) Modified on 9/9/2021 (kls3).
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Eric Pearson on behalf of Mohammed Farhat (Pearson, Tyler)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke L Stevens on behalf of Mohammed Farhat (Stevens, Brooke)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Articles in REM (kek)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by USA (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-1073-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $24,000.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $24,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mohammed Farhat
Represented By: Brooke L Stevens
Represented By: Glenn Seiden
Represented By: Tyler Eric Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?