Kelly v. Schakel
Plaintiff: Tony D Kelly
Defendant: Alan D Schakel
Case Number: 3:2021cv01082
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery due by 6/8/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2022. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/5/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 10/17/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony D Kelly. Alan D Schakel served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Katzman, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Return of Service Executed filed by Tony D Kelly. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Service of Process> Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline.(lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY STRICKEN: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Tony D Kelly on 09/14/21. (Katzman, Daniel) Modified on 9/22/2021 (lmb).
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/5/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 10/17/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Avellino, Victor)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Avellino, Victor)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Avellino on behalf of Alan D Schakel (Avellino, Victor)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alan D Schakel. Original mailed to attorney Daniel Katzman. (lmb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1082-JPG. (lmb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan D Schakel ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4571036.), filed by Tony D Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Civil Summons)(Katzman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Schakel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony D Kelly
Represented By: Daniel C. Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan D Schakel
Represented By: Victor Avellino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?