Holt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: CHARLES DALE HOLT
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01154
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE - All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Nonetheless, to maintain an equalized docket and to foster efficiency, this action will not be referred to a magistrate judge at this time. See Administrative Order No. 293. Accordingly, until further notice, this case will remain with the assigned district judge. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Thornton-Green, Donna) Modified on 10/18/2021 (clt).
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wyatt, Nathan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to counsel for service. (amv)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/21/2021. (mlp)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Thornton-Green on behalf of Charles Dale Holt (Thornton-Green, Donna)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Dale Holt. (Thornton-Green, Donna)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #1 Complaint, filed by Charles Dale Holt. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. Plaintiff is directed to re-file a Motion and Affidavit to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs as a separate document. A fillable motion is available on the Court's website www.ilsd.uscourts.gov. Proposed Orders shall be emailed directly to the judge's proposed documents email. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1154-NJR. (amv)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by CHARLES DALE HOLT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Affidavit Motion to Proceed Without Payment of Fees, #6 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Thornton-Green, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES DALE HOLT
Represented By: Donna Thornton-Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?