Korpolewski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dennie K. Korpolewski
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01188
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A court may permit a plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis where the plaintiff has demonstrated indigence. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Nevertheless, a court can dismiss a qualified plaintiff's case if the action is clearly frivolous or malicious. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court finds that Plaintiff Dennie K. Korpolewski's affidavit demonstrates indigence. Additionally, in Korpolewski's Complaint, she states that she seeks review of a decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration as permitted under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Accordingly, the Court finds nothing in the file to indicate that this action is frivolous or malicious. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Korpolewski's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/12/2021. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Summons Issued. Docket Clerk error, summons was issued prematurely as IFP is still pending. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 STRICKEN Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Olinsky. (kdw) Modified on 9/29/2021 (kdw).
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1188-SPM. (kdw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Dennie K. Korpolewski (Olinsky, Howard)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennie K. Korpolewski. (Olinsky, Howard)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Dennie K. Korpolewski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korpolewski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennie K. Korpolewski
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?