Cantrell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Harvey Cantrell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration (Atlanta) and SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01282
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to Plaintiff (clt)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the opinion of this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illionois as set out. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/18/2021. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff. [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint filed by Harvey Cantrell that this action be transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of Illinois. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/24/21. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 (Second) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey Cantrell. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harvey Cantrell. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Harvey Cantrell. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet); ref to Judge Murray (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
July 19, 2021 NEF (doc. 2), Motion IFP form and pro se litigant guide mailed to Harvey Cantrell. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, filed the complaint in this action purportedly on behalf of his brother. Plaintiff's complaint is deficient in several respects: 1) Plaintiff has failed to set forth the grounds upon which this Court could exercise jurisdiction over this matter; that is, Plaintiff has failed to state whether he is proceeding under federal question jurisdiction or diversity jurisdiction in bringing this action; 2) Plaintiff has failed to set forth facts which would demonstrate how he has standing or authority to bring this action on behalf of his allegedly deceased brother; 3) Plaintiff has attached documents to his Complaint which indicate that he is attempting to appeal a social security decision on behalf of his brother, but he has not named a defendant or defendants in his complaint; 4) Plaintiff's complaint fails to set forth a cause of action and the facts supporting the cause of action; and 5) Plaintiff's complaint fails to set forth any request for relief. In addition to these deficiencies, Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to pay the filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee on or before July 30, 2021. Plaintiff is also ORDERED to file an amended complaint that cures each and every of the above listed deficiencies on or before July 30, 2021. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to pay the filing fee or to file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee and failure to file an amended complaint on or before July 30, 2021 WILL result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a copy of this order, a copy of the form motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, and a copy of the pro se litigant's guide. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/16/21. (lto) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Harvey Cantrell. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 5/11/2021; ref to Judge Murray (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 10/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration (Atlanta)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?