Slafter v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Slafter
Defendant: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01326
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike the Nationwide Class Claims by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hudson, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. Document is a duplicate of document 14. No further action required by e-filer. (jlh)
November 1, 2021 Set Deadlines: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. answer due 11/23/2021. (kek)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Catalano on behalf of Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (Catalano, Amanda) Modified on 11/2/2021 (jlh).
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Catalano on behalf of Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (Catalano, Amanda)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING re #11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead. Pleadings due on or before 11/23/2021. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/29/2021. (cdc) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Yevgeniy Y. Turin on behalf of Brian Slafter (Turin, Yevgeniy)
October 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Hudson, Timothy)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan R. Frysinger on behalf of Brian Slafter (Frysinger, Jordan)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Ryan on behalf of Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (Ryan, Megan)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, (CIVIL COVER SHEET). (Hudson, Timothy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/26/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to Attorney Frysinger regarding admision to SDIL. (tba)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-1326-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tba)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Hudson, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Hudson on behalf of Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (Hudson, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Fourth Judicial Circuit Marion County IL, case number 2021-MR-148 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4614261), filed by Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hudson, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slafter v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Slafter
Represented By: Jordan R. Frysinger
Represented By: Yevgeniy Y. Turin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Hudson
Represented By: Amanda Catalano
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?