Singh v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Randeep Singh
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc. and Alamoun Alkhatib
Case Number: 3:2021cv01342
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Slough, Stephen)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 10/24/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 28 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/10/2022. (tag)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/13/2021. (tag)
December 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/23/2021 (lmb)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Slough on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Slough, Stephen)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ACTION re #10 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Randeep Singh.See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Slough does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Randeep Singh. Response to motion to dismiss due 12/23/2021. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/1/2021. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by Randeep Singh. (Slough, Stephen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Reda, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Reda, Michael)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Reda, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by P.A.M. Transport, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Madison County Circuit Court (Filed) (Reda, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. McGonigle on behalf of P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (McGonigle, Adam)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Reda on behalf of P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (Reda, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by P.A.M. Transport, Inc..See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Michael Reda does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-1342-JPG. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tba)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County Circuit Court, case number 2020-L-01670 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4616413), filed by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court File)(Reda, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randeep Singh
Represented By: Stephen R. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Reda
Represented By: Adam S. McGonigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamoun Alkhatib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?